Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03947
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 29, 2017
Terminated:Dec 11, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Robert E. Stuart
Represented By
Robert E. Stuart
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
8 8 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 12/11 7:52 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Mon 12/10 12:06 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 26, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/26 11:28 AM
Amended Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY,4 Certificate of Service filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 Order Approving Amended Procedures Governing Avoidance Action Adversary Proceedings
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:11 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/11 3:19 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 05/30 9:35 AM
Summons and notice issued to Robert E. Stuart Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, May 29, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 05/29 10:04 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03947 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26316044, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 05/29 6:44 PM
Adversary case 17-03947 Complaint against Robert E. Stuart filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2