Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03948
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 29, 2017
Terminated:Nov 20, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Community Family Healthcare
Represented By
Community Family Healthcare
contact info
Defendant
Joy Franks
Represented By
Joy Franks
contact info
Defendant
Gregory D. Pirkle
Represented By
Gregory D. Pirkle
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
12 12 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 11/20 11:15 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 19, 2018
11 11 notice Notice of Dismissal Mon 11/19 5:03 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
10 10 answer None Tue 10/17 5:24 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by John D. McIntyre on behalf of Community Family Healthcare, Joy Franks, Gregory D. Pirkle. (McIntyre, John)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
9 9 misc Letter Thu 08/10 11:38 AM
Letter Related [+] filed by Gregory D. Pirkle. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
8 8 court Reopen Adversary Proceeding Tue 08/08 10:25 AM
Reopen Adversary Proceeding (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 08/08 9:21 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2017
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal Mon 08/07 2:05 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Gregory D. Pirkle filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:11 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/11 3:21 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 05/30 9:36 AM
Summons and notice issued to Community Family Healthcare ; Joy Franks ; Gregory D. Pirkle Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, May 29, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 05/29 10:04 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03948 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26316044, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 05/29 6:46 PM
Adversary case 17-03948 Complaint against Community Family Healthcare, Joy Franks, Gregory D. Pirkle filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2