Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03960
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 29, 2017
Terminated:May 11, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Summit Healthcare Association
Represented By
Summit Healthcare Association
contact info
Defendant
John Corder
Represented By
John Corder
contact info
Defendant
Becky Thompson
Represented By
Becky Thompson
contact info
Defendant
Steve Garrett
Represented By
Steve Garrett
contact info
Defendant
Sean Smithson
Represented By
Sean Smithson
contact info
Defendant
Doug Wright
Represented By
Doug Wright
contact info
Defendant
Paul Watson
Represented By
Paul Watson
contact info
Defendant
Neal Thompson
Represented By
Neal Thompson
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Friday, May 11, 2018
7 7 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Fri 05/11 9:28 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 10, 2018
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 05/10 1:50 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:11 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/11 9:29 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 05/30 9:55 AM
Summons and notice issued to John Corder ; Steve Garrett ; Sean Smithson ; Summit Healthcare Association ; Becky Thompson ; Neal Thompson ; Paul Watson ; Doug Wright Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, May 29, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 05/29 10:04 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03960 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26316044, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 05/29 8:51 PM
Adversary case 17-03960 Complaint against Summit Healthcare Association, John Corder, Becky Thompson, Steve Garrett, Sean Smithson, Doug Wright, Paul Watson, Neal Thompson filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2