Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:Samuel H Mays, Jr
Referred: Charmiane G Claxton
Case #: 2:17-cv-02367
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:May 26, 2017
Terminated:May 31, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2017 4:08 AM CST
Defendant
The Juiceplus Company
Represented By
Brandon K. Thompkins
Waller Lansden Dortch & Davis, LLP
contact info
Aron Z. Karabel
Waller Lansden Dortch & Davis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Eligah Ragland
1417 Hickory Way Apt. 3
Memphis, TN 38119


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 31, 2018
30 30 order Judgment Thu 05/31 4:50 PM
JUDGMENT in accordance with the Order of Dismissal, docketed May 31, 2018. This action is dismissed for failure of plaintiff to prosecute. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 05/31/2018. (Mays, Samuel)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/31 4:29 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This case is, therefore, DISMISSED for failure of plaintiff to prosecute. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 05/31/2018. (Mays, Samuel)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Status Conference Thu 05/31 2:54 PM
MINUTES: Telephone Conference held on 05/31/2018 before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Atty Brandon Thompkins participated on behalf of the deft; plaintiff failed to appear at conference & failed to respond to the Court's order directing plaintiff to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute24 , although proper notice was given. Atty Thompkins brought to the court's attention a note his office recvd from plaintiff's former attorney Ms. Dowdy representing Mr. Eligah Ragland is in jail. Court to dismiss case for failure to prosecute. Order to enter. (Court Reporter: Nicole Warren)(zsf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/03 1:44 PM
Domestic Return Receipt of certified mail to Eligah Ragland (jae)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
26 26 notice Setting Letter Wed 05/02 9:36 AM
SETTING LETTER: A Telephone Conference is set on Thursday, 05/31/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Please review the attached setting letter for call-in instructions. (jl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
25 25 order Order Mon 04/30 11:08 AM
ORDER DISMISSING action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 04 30-2018 (Mays, Samuel)
Related: [-]
minutes ~Util - Document Sealed Mon 04/30 12:00 PM
DOCUMENT SEALED25 . ORDER dismissing case entered prematurely and should be DISREGARDED. (Mays, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
24 24 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 04/17 5:00 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 4/27/2018.. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 04 17-2018 (Mays, Samuel)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/17 4:35 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION22 TO WITHDRAW, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 04/17/2018. Attorney Jahari Dowdy is withdrawn from further representation of plaintiff Eligah Ragland. (Mays, Samuel)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 04/17 1:37 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and memo (proposed order submitted) by Eligah Ragland. (Dowdy, Jahari)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
21 21 discov Response to Discovery Request Tue 02/20 6:47 PM
RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Plaintiff by Eligah Ragland.(Dowdy, Jahari)
Related: [-]
20 20 discov Answer to Interrogatories Tue 02/20 6:43 PM
ANSWER to Interrogatories from Plaintiff by Eligah Ragland.(Dowdy, Jahari)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/20 6:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jahari M. Dowdy on behalf of Eligah Ragland (Dowdy, Jahari)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Affidavit Tue 02/20 5:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT re17 Order on Motion to Compel by The Juiceplus Company.(Karabel, Aron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Billing Records and Invoices re Juice Plus' Motion to Compel
Wednesday, February 07, 2018
notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/07 8:49 AM
NOTICE Order #17 sent certified mail to Eligah Ragland, 9590 9402 1730 6074 7191 75. (jld)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Tue 02/06 3:32 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 2/6/2018. (Claxton, Charmiane)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2018
16 16 motion Compel Mon 01/22 3:06 PM
MOTION to Compel by The Juiceplus Company.(Karabel, Aron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery and Modify the Scheduling Order,
Att: 2 Declaration of Brandon K. Thompkins, Esq.,
Att: 3 Exhibits to the Declaration of Brandon K. Thompkins, Esq.,
Att: 4 Certificate of Consultation
Monday, August 07, 2017
15 15 order Scheduling Order Mon 08/07 11:28 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER and TRIAL SETTING, signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 08/07/2017. The following deadlines and schedules are established: motions for joining parties/amending pleadings deadline: 11/07/17; discovery deadline: 02/07/18; mediation deadline: 03/07/18; dispositive motions deadline: 04/09/18. Jury Trial set Monday, 08/27/2017 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Pretrial Conference set Friday, 07/27/2018 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. This order will not be modified except upon showing of good cause. (Mays, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2017
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/31 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon K. Thompkins on behalf of The Juiceplus Company (Thompkins, Brandon)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/31 4:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Juiceplus Company identifying Corporate Parent NSA International, LLC for The Juiceplus Company.. (Karabel, Aron)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/31 4:35 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by The Juiceplus Company.(Karabel, Aron)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/31 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aron Z. Karabel on behalf of The Juiceplus Company (Karabel, Aron)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2017
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/21 3:13 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to The Juiceplus Company. (jae)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2017
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Tue 06/27 1:33 PM
Domestic Return Receipt of certified mail to Eligah Ragland. (jae)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
8 8 service Summons Issued Fri 06/09 11:40 AM
Summons Issued as to The Juiceplus Company. (jld)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 06/08 3:47 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and to effect and issue service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton on 6/8/2017. (Claxton, Charmiane)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Referral to Magistrate Judge Mon 06/12 9:38 AM
Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters, including screening of the complaint to determine whether or not summons shall be issued by the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B) and Local Rule 4.1(b)(2) (csf)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2017
6 6 notice ADR Compliance Tue 05/30 1:10 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (csf)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Tue 05/30 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice LR 16.2 Tue 05/30 1:08 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/30 1:08 PM
NOTICE : Signed agreement to receive notice of electronic filing (NEF) by Eligah Ragland (csf)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/30 1:07 PM
Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eligah Ragland. (csf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Pro Se Complaint Tue 05/30 1:06 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT Under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 2000r filed by Eligah Ragland against The Juiceplus Company.(csf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EEOC Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Judicial Cards