Citi Cars, Inc. v. ACE Funding Source, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-26681
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-26681
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | A Jay Cristol |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-01216 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ACE Funding Source, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Citi Cars, Inc.
1776 N Pine Island Rd #102
Plantation, FL 33322 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 11/03 9:33 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant ACE Funding Source, LLC . (Rodal, Yechezkel) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 11/03 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 11/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
order
Withdraw As Attorney Order
Tue 10/31 11:28 AM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw Yechezkel Rodal and Rodal Law, PA As Attorney For Defendant Ace Funding Source, LLC . (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 10/28 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document |
|
43 | 43
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 10/28 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 10/27/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Wed 10/25 12:55 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Stephen C Breuer . (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
41 | 41
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Wed 10/25 12:54 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Citi Cars, Inc. . (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
40 | 40
court
Notice of Entry of Judgment
Wed 10/25 10:14 AM
Notice of Entry . (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
39 | 39
order
Judgment
Wed 10/25 10:01 AM
Amended Final Judgment in Favor of Citi Cars, Inc. Against ACE Funding Source, LLC |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Amend
Tue 10/24 1:57 PM
Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Amend Re:10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment and to enter Amended Final Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Citi Cars, Inc. (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Final Judgment | ||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 10/23 11:59 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Filed by Defendant ACE Funding Source, LLC (Rodal, Yechezkel) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Wed 10/11 11:01 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Stephen C Breuer . (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
35 | 35
order
Shorten Time Order
Wed 10/11 9:35 AM
Order Granting Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time to Respond to Discovery Requests . (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
attydoc
Notice of Unavailability [Attorney]
Mon 10/09 4:03 PM
Notice of Unavailability from October 9, 2017 to October 13, 2017 by Attorney Yechezkel Rodal. (Rodal, Yechezkel) |
|
33 | 33
answer
Response
Mon 10/09 4:02 PM
Response to (31 Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time to Respond to Discovery Requests filed by Plaintiff Citi Cars, Inc.) Filed by Defendant ACE Funding Source, LLC (Rodal, Yechezkel) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Bill of Costs
Fri 10/06 2:10 PM
Bill of Costs Filed by Plaintiff Citi Cars, Inc.. (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Shorten Time
Fri 10/06 1:25 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time to Respond to Discovery Requests Filed by Plaintiff Citi Cars, Inc. (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Exhibit "A" | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "B" | ||
30 | 30
order
Quash Order
Fri 10/06 11:48 AM
Order Denying Motion To Vacate Default And Default Final Judgment , Denying Motion To Quash Service Of Process. (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 10/02 5:04 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant ACE Funding Source, LLC . (Rodal, Yechezkel) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Notice of Compliance/Non-Compliance
Wed 09/27 3:32 PM
Notice of Compliance Filed by Defendant ACE Funding Source, LLC . (Rodal, Yechezkel) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 09/23 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Extend Time Order
Thu 09/21 9:59 AM
Agreed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Order to Court (Catala, Nilda) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Extend Time Order
Wed 09/20 7:43 AM
Order Granting Ex Parte Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Submit a Proposed Order on Defendants Motion to Vacate Default and Default Final Judgment and Motion to Quash Service of Process (Extended Until 9/25/2017.. (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extend Time
Tue 09/19 6:20 PM
Motion for Joinder to Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Submit Proposed Order , in addition to Agreed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Submit Proposed Order Filed by Plaintiff Citi Cars, Inc. (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extend Time
Mon 09/18 5:28 PM
Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to Submit a Proposed Order on Defendants Motion to Vacate Default Filed by Defendant ACE Funding Source, LLC (Rodal, Yechezkel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
answer
Objection
Mon 08/28 6:39 PM
Objection to (17 Motion to Vacate (Re:10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment) filed by Defendant ACE Funding Source, LLC, Motion to Quash) Filed by Plaintiff Citi Cars, Inc. (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 08/28 6:20 PM
Notice of Filing NY Department of State Records , Filed by Plaintiff Citi Cars, Inc. . (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/25 5:25 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant ACE Funding Source, LLC . (Rodal, Yechezkel) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Filing
Tue 08/15 5:10 PM
Notice of Filing Affidavit of Costs , Filed by Plaintiff Citi Cars, Inc.. (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
court
Notice of Hearing (AP)
Fri 08/04 3:26 PM
Notice of Hearing |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Quash
Fri 08/04 9:50 AM
Motion to Vacate , Motion to Quash Service of Process Filed by Defendant ACE Funding Source, LLC (Rodal, Yechezkel) **THIS REPLACES DE#16** (Perusso, Conce) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Vacate
Thu 08/03 11:21 PM
**SEE REPLACEMENT DE#17**Motion to Vacate Filed by Defendant ACE Funding Source, LLC (Rodal, Yechezkel) Modified on 8/4/2017 to reflect two part motion (Perusso, Conce) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Thu 08/03 2:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Yechezkel Rodal Filed by Defendant ACE Funding Source, LLC. (Rodal, Yechezkel) |
|
14 | 14
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 08/03 2:47 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-1216 Closed. Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff (Cargill, Barbara) |
|
Saturday, July 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 07/16 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
Notice of Entry of Judgment
Thu 07/13 9:36 AM
Notice of Entry |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Wed 07/12 10:48 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Stephen C Breuer . (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
10 | 10
order
Default Judgment Order
Wed 07/12 9:15 AM
Order Granting Motion For Default Final Judgment . (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 07/08 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/07/2017. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 07/07 9:44 AM
Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment Against ACE Funding Source, LLC (Clerk's Default Final Judgment) Filed by Plaintiff Citi Cars, Inc. (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Wed 07/05 8:32 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant ACE Funding Source, LLC. (Montygierd, Hebe) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Default
Mon 07/03 10:44 AM
Motion for Default Against Defendant ACE Funding Source, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Citi Cars, Inc. (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Thu 06/01 10:28 AM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Stephen C Breuer . (Breuer, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Setting Requirements (Adv)
Wed 05/31 10:44 AM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial . Initial Disclosure of Witnesses and Documents Shall Be Made at Least 20 Days Before Pretrial Date . (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Wed 05/31 10:42 AM
Summons Issued on ACE Funding Source, LLC Answer Due 6/30/2017 [Trial Shall be Held During One-Week Trial Period Beginning on the Date of Pretrial] Pretrial Conference set for 08/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at C. Clyde Atkins U.S. Courthouse, 301 N Miami Ave Courtroom 7 (AJC), Miami, FL 33128. (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit
Tue 05/30 2:16 PM
Affidavit of Bahram Armakan Filed by Plaintiff Citi Cars, Inc.. (Breuer, Stephen). Related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Citi Cars, Inc.. *Modified on 5/31/2017 To Add Link* (Garcia, Nelly) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/30 2:14 PM
Adversary case 17-01216 Complaint by Citi Cars, Inc. against ACE Funding Source, LLC. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Breuer, Stephen) |