Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-03974
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 30, 2017
Terminated:Jun 02, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michelle M. Fischer
Represented By
Michelle M. Fischer
contact info
Defendant
Deborah Haynes
Represented By
Deborah Haynes
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Friday, June 02, 2023
46 46 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Fri 06/02 3:19 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
45 45 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 05/17 10:00 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
44 44 misc Withdrawal Tue 02/14 3:03 PM
Withdrawal Notice of Withdrawal of Pleadings Without Prejudice by the Liquidating Trustee Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)40 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,41 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,42 Notice of Hearing filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
43 43 3 pgs order Order on Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Tue 02/14 1:22 PM
Order Granting Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] 20
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
42 42 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/01 2:22 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 2/21/2023 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)40 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,41 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
41 41 motion Sealed Document Wed 02/01 2:20 PM
Sealed Motion/Applicatio Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)40 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
40 40 motion Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Wed 02/01 2:18 PM
Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Motion for Authority to File Under Seal a Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement or, Alternatively, Enter Default Judgment and to Seal the Hearing on the Motion filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
39 39 misc Withdrawal Wed 01/18 2:18 PM
Withdrawal Notice of Withdrawal of Pleadings Without Prejudice by the Liquidating Trustee Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)22 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,35 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, December 22, 2022
38 38 court Hearing continued Thu 12/22 2:48 PM
Hearing held and continued; Appearance(s): Brittany Falabella for Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 1/26/2023 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)22 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
37 37 court Hearing held Thu 12/22 2:45 PM
Hearing held; Motion GRANTED; Appearance(s): Brittany Falabella for Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
36 36 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 12/07 1:10 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Further Continued Hearing Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2022 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,22 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,35 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
35 35 motion Sealed Document Wed 12/07 1:07 PM
Sealed Exhibi Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,22 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
34 34 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 11/15 4:55 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Brittany Berlauk Falabella of Hirschler Fleischer, A Professional Corp on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Falabella, Brittany)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,22 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, October 27, 2022
33 33 court Hearing continued Thu 10/27 11:42 AM
Hearing continued per agenda filed in bankruptcy case 15-32919 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, September 29, 2022
32 32 court Hearing continued Thu 09/29 4:14 PM
Hearing continued per agenda filed in bankruptcy case 15-32919 ; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, August 25, 2022
31 31 court Hearing continued Thu 08/25 1:54 PM
Hearing continued per agenda filed in bankruptcy case 15-32919 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 9/29/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, July 14, 2022
30 30 court Hearing continued Thu 07/14 4:58 PM
Hearing continued per agenda filed; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 8/25/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Saturday, July 09, 2022
29 29 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Sun 07/10 12:11 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)27 Transcript filed
Friday, July 08, 2022
28 28 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Sat 07/09 12:21 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)26 Transcript filed
Friday, July 01, 2022
27 27 court Transcript filed Fri 07/01 1:29 PM
Transcript filed Re: Hearing Held 5/31/2022, Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 09/29/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, LLC, Telephone number 973-406-2250.] [Transcript Purchased by Robert Westermann.] Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 07/8/2022. Redaction Request Due By 07/22/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 08/1/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 09/29/2022. (Gottlieb, Jason)
Related: [-] 24 Hearing continued per agenda filed; (Re: related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee) Hearing scheduled for 6/30/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia.
26 26 court Transcript filed Fri 07/01 12:32 PM
Transcript filed Re: Hearing Held 6/30/2022, Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 09/29/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, LLC, Telephone number 973-406-2250.] [Transcript Purchased by Robert Westermann.] Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 07/8/2022. Redaction Request Due By 07/22/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 08/1/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 09/29/2022. (Gottlieb, Jason)
Related: [-] 25 Hearing continued per agenda filed; (Re: related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee) Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia.
Thursday, June 30, 2022
25 25 court Hearing continued Thu 06/30 12:47 PM
Hearing continued per agenda filed; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 7/14/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
24 24 court Hearing continued Tue 05/31 2:44 PM
Hearing continued per agenda filed; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 6/30/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Friday, February 04, 2022
23 23 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 02/04 1:42 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2022 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)22 Sealed Document filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
22 22 motion Sealed Document Fri 02/04 1:40 PM
Sealed Motion/Applicatio Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
21 21 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Fri 02/04 1:37 PM
Notice of Motion to Seal Related [+] filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-] related document(s)20 Motion to File Documents(s) Under Seal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
20 20 motion Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Fri 02/04 1:36 PM
Motion to File Document(s) Under Seal Motion for Authority to File Under Seal a Motion to Confess and Enter Judgment and to Seal the Hearing on the Motion to Confess filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
19 19 order Directing Tue 06/30 9:39 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney; Cullen Drescher Speckhart terminated; Robert S. Westermann for Richard Arrowsmith added (Motion filed in 15-32919 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/04 3:53 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Joshua David Stiff of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-] related document(s)17 Order on Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney
Monday, October 28, 2019
17 17 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Mon 10/28 9:09 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Related [+]Diana L.C. McGraw terminated; (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] 16
Thursday, October 10, 2019
16 16 motion Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Thu 10/10 4:51 PM
Notice and Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney -Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Related [+] . (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-] -Docketed to Include Certificate of Service
Thursday, October 03, 2019
15 15 motion Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Thu 10/03 1:38 PM
Notice and Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney -Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel . (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Thu 10/03 12:11 PM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw. (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/20 10:03 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 19, 2018
12 12 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Mon 11/19 7:41 AM
Notice of Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)11 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
11 11 motion Entry of Default Mon 11/19 7:40 AM
Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 12, 2018
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/12 9:10 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,9 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
9 9 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 09/11 11:21 AM
Alias Summons and notice issued to Michelle M. Fischer Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, September 10, 2018
8 8 misc Request for Alias Summons Mon 09/10 9:36 AM
Request for Alias Summons for Michelle M. Fischer filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Mon 09/10 8:56 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding of Defendant Deborah Haynes filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/13 10:56 AM
Amended Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY,4 Certificate of Service filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Att: 1 Order Approving Amended Procedures Governing Avoidance Action Adversary Proceedings
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:11 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/11 5:41 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Wed 05/31 4:17 PM
Summons and notice issued to Michelle M. Fischer ; Deborah Haynes Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 05/30 5:20 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-03974 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26325383, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 05/30 4:11 PM
Adversary case 17-03974 Complaint against Michelle M. Fischer, Deborah Haynes filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2