Minnesota District Court
Judge:Paul A Magnuson
Referred: Becky R Thorson
Case #: 0:17-cv-01826
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 31, 2017
Terminated:Dec 19, 2019
Last checked: Monday Nov 27, 2017 3:47 AM CST
Defendant
Emily Piper
Represented By
Jason Marisam
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Janine Wetzel Kimble
Minnesota Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Alethea M Huyser
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Janine Moore
Represented By
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Kristen G Marttila
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
David J Zoll
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Daniel P Rogan
contact info
Brian D Clark
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Michael O Freeman
Hennepin County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer DeCubellis
Represented By
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Kristen G Marttila
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
David J Zoll
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Daniel P Rogan
contact info
Brian D Clark
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Michael O Freeman
Hennepin County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Hennepin County
Represented By
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Kristen G Marttila
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
David J Zoll
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Daniel P Rogan
contact info
Brian D Clark
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Michael O Freeman
Hennepin County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Hennepin County Department of Human Services and Public Health
Represented By
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Kristen G Marttila
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
David J Zoll
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Daniel P Rogan
contact info
Brian D Clark
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Michael O Freeman
Hennepin County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
David J. Hough
Represented By
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Kristen G Marttila
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
David J Zoll
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Daniel P Rogan
contact info
Brian D Clark
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Michael O Freeman
Hennepin County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jodi Wentland
Represented By
Rachel Ann Kitze Collins
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Kristen G Marttila
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
David J Zoll
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Charles N Nauen
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Daniel P Rogan
contact info
Brian D Clark
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Michael O Freeman
Hennepin County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
B.W.
Represented By
Sarah Jaffe
A Better Childhood, Inc
contact info
Katherine K Bruce
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Larry E. LaTarte
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Eric Jason Hecker
Cuti Hecker Wang LLP
contact info
James L Volling
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Justman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Cicely R Miltich
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Laura Reilly
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Marcia Robinson Lowry
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Staci L. Perdue
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
D.W.
Represented By
Sarah Jaffe
A Better Childhood, Inc
contact info
Katherine K Bruce
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Larry E. LaTarte
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Eric Jason Hecker
Cuti Hecker Wang LLP
contact info
James L Volling
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Justman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Cicely R Miltich
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Laura Reilly
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Marcia Robinson Lowry
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Staci L. Perdue
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
I.W.
Represented By
Sarah Jaffe
A Better Childhood, Inc
contact info
Katherine K Bruce
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Larry E. LaTarte
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Eric Jason Hecker
Cuti Hecker Wang LLP
contact info
James L Volling
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Justman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Cicely R Miltich
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Laura Reilly
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Marcia Robinson Lowry
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Staci L. Perdue
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
T.T.
Represented By
Sarah Jaffe
A Better Childhood, Inc
contact info
Erica A. Reed
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Marjan A Batchelor
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Katherine K Bruce
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Larry E. LaTarte
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Eric Jason Hecker
Cuti Hecker Wang LLP
contact info
James L Volling
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Justman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Cicely R Miltich
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Laura Reilly
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Marcia Robinson Lowry
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Staci L. Perdue
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
T.M.
Represented By
Sarah Jaffe
A Better Childhood, Inc
contact info
Erica A. Reed
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Marjan A Batchelor
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Katherine K Bruce
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Larry E. LaTarte
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Eric Jason Hecker
Cuti Hecker Wang LLP
contact info
James L Volling
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Justman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Cicely R Miltich
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Laura Reilly
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Marcia Robinson Lowry
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Staci L. Perdue
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
T.F.
Represented By
Sarah Jaffe
A Better Childhood, Inc
contact info
Erica A. Reed
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Marjan A Batchelor
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Katherine K Bruce
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Larry E. LaTarte
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Eric Jason Hecker
Cuti Hecker Wang LLP
contact info
James L Volling
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Justman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Cicely R Miltich
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Laura Reilly
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Marcia Robinson Lowry
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Staci L. Perdue
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
T.E.
Represented By
Sarah Jaffe
A Better Childhood, Inc
contact info
Erica A. Reed
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Marjan A Batchelor
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Katherine K Bruce
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Larry E. LaTarte
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Eric Jason Hecker
Cuti Hecker Wang LLP
contact info
James L Volling
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Justman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Cicely R Miltich
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Laura Reilly
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Marcia Robinson Lowry
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Staci L. Perdue
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
M.T.
Represented By
Sarah Jaffe
A Better Childhood, Inc
contact info
Erica A. Reed
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Marjan A Batchelor
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Katherine K Bruce
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Larry E. LaTarte
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Eric Jason Hecker
Cuti Hecker Wang LLP
contact info
James L Volling
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Justman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Cicely R Miltich
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Laura Reilly
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Marcia Robinson Lowry
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Staci L. Perdue
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
L.L.
Represented By
Sarah Jaffe
A Better Childhood, Inc
contact info
Erica A. Reed
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Marjan A Batchelor
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Katherine K Bruce
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Larry E. LaTarte
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Eric Jason Hecker
Cuti Hecker Wang LLP
contact info
James L Volling
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Justman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Cicely R Miltich
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Laura Reilly
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Marcia Robinson Lowry
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Staci L. Perdue
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
K.D.
Represented By
Sarah Jaffe
A Better Childhood, Inc
contact info
Erica A. Reed
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Marjan A Batchelor
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Katherine K Bruce
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Larry E. LaTarte
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Eric Jason Hecker
Cuti Hecker Wang LLP
contact info
James L Volling
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Justman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Cicely R Miltich
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Laura Reilly
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Marcia Robinson Lowry
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Staci L. Perdue
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
C.O.
Represented By
Sarah Jaffe
A Better Childhood, Inc
contact info
Erica A. Reed
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Marjan A Batchelor
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Katherine K Bruce
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Larry E. LaTarte
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Eric Jason Hecker
Cuti Hecker Wang LLP
contact info
James L Volling
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Justman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Cicely R Miltich
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Laura Reilly
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Marcia Robinson Lowry
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Staci L. Perdue
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
A.W.
Represented By
Sarah Jaffe
A Better Childhood, Inc
contact info
Erica A. Reed
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Marjan A Batchelor
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Katherine K Bruce
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Larry E. LaTarte
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Eric Jason Hecker
Cuti Hecker Wang LLP
contact info
James L Volling
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Justman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Cicely R Miltich
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Laura Reilly
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Marcia Robinson Lowry
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Staci L. Perdue
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
A.T.
Represented By
Sarah Jaffe
A Better Childhood, Inc
contact info
Erica A. Reed
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Marjan A Batchelor
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Katherine K Bruce
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Larry E. LaTarte
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Eric Jason Hecker
Cuti Hecker Wang LLP
contact info
James L Volling
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Justman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Cicely R Miltich
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Laura Reilly
Faegre Baker Daniels
contact info
Marcia Robinson Lowry
A Better Childhood, Inc.
contact info
Staci L. Perdue
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jamie Sorensen
Terminated: 09/18/2017
Represented By
Jason Marisam
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Janine Wetzel Kimble
Minnesota Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Alethea M Huyser
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
James G. Koppel
Terminated: 09/18/2017
Represented By
Jason Marisam
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Janine Wetzel Kimble
Minnesota Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Alethea M Huyser
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info

GPO Feb 16 2018
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion to Dismiss/General; granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion to Dismiss/General. Plaintiffs Third Cause of Action is DISMISSED with prejudice; Plaintiffs Second and Fourth Causes of Action are DISMISSED without prejudice.(Written Opinion.) Signed by Judge Paul A. Magnuson on 2/16/2018. (ALT)
GPO Sep 27 2018
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Hennepin County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 97 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; 2. The Commissioner's Motion to Dismiss 91 is GRANTED; and 3. Plaintiffs' Second Cause of Action [86, pars. 413-18] is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Written Opinion) Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 9/27/2018. (LLM)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 01, 2021
265 265 misc Transcript Mon 03/01 10:12 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Provisional Class Certification held on 7/30/2019 before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (29 pages). Court Reporter: Tim Willette. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents . Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review [LINK:Local Rule 5.5] and Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings . Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 3/8/2021. Redaction Request due 3/22/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2021. (TJW)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
264 264 misc Transcript Fri 02/26 9:25 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Final Approval of Settlement held on 12/19/2019 before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (9 pages). Court Reporter: Renee Rogge. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents . Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review [LINK:Local Rule 5.5] and Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings . Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 3/5/2021. Redaction Request due 3/19/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/27/2021. (RAR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
263 263 misc Transcript Request Tue 02/23 1:42 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of258 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Renee Rogge. (JGK)
Related: [-]
262 262 misc Transcript Request Tue 02/23 1:41 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of 231 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Tim Willette. (JGK)
Related: [-]