Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-04027
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 31, 2017
Terminated:Aug 25, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Philip Bonnet MD P.C.
Represented By
Philip Bonnet MD P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Philip Bonnet
Represented By
Philip Bonnet
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Friday, August 25, 2017
7 7 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Fri 08/25 9:55 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2017
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 08/24 1:19 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:20 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Tue 07/11 9:20 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Thursday, June 01, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/01 10:22 AM
Summons and notice issued to Philip Bonnet ; Philip Bonnet MD P.C. Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 05/31 8:08 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-04027 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26333987, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 05/31 7:18 PM
Adversary case 17-04027 Complaint against Philip Bonnet MD P.C., Philip Bonnet filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2