Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Robin J Cauthron
Case #: 5:17-cv-00608
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jun 01, 2017
Terminated:Jul 17, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 28, 2017 3:24 AM CST
Defendant
Putnam City Schools
Represented By
Anthony T Childers
The Center For Education Law
contact info
Laura L Holmes
The Center For Education Law
contact info
Defendant
Fred Rhodes
Represented By
Anthony T Childers
The Center For Education Law
contact info
Laura L Holmes
The Center For Education Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Clifton Wayne Smith, Jr
2609 N. Grant Avenue
Bethany, OK 73008


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, July 17, 2017
12 12 order Order Dismissing Case Mon 07/17 1:41 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE11 Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal; mailed to Clifton Wayne Smith, Jr 2609 N. Grant Avenue Bethany, OK 73008. Signed by Honorable Robin J. Cauthron on 7/17/17. (lg)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Mon 07/17 10:38 AM
MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by Clifton Wayne Smith, Jr. (em)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2017
10 10 respm Response to Motion Thu 07/13 11:31 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Clifton Wayne Smith, Jr.(em)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Email Exchange between Wayne Smith and April Grace
Monday, June 26, 2017
9 9 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 06/26 3:53 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Laura L Holmes on behalf of All Defendants (Holmes, Laura)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Mon 06/26 3:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by All Defendants. (Childers, Anthony)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 06/26 3:17 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony T Childers on behalf of All Defendants (Childers, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2017
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/09 1:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifton Wayne Smith, Jr. Putnam City Schools served on 6/5/2017. (em)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 06/09 1:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifton Wayne Smith, Jr. Fred Rhodes served on 6/5/2017. (em)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
4 4 order Order Reassigning Case Wed 06/07 1:49 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 6/7/2017. (mb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
3 3 misc Receipt Thu 06/01 11:17 AM
Receipt for Money Received from Clifton Wayne Smith, Jr in the amount of $400, receipt number OKW500061053 regarding1 Complaint (ml)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 06/01 11:14 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Putnam City Schools, Fred Rhodes. (ml)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/01 11:13 AM
COMPLAINT against Putnam City Schools, Fred Rhodes filed by Clifton Wayne Smith, Jr.(ml)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1-EEOC Forms,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet