Graham v. Huffman et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Lee Yeakel |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00536 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:77 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jun 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2017 3:40 AM CST |
Defendant
Saeed "Sam" Talari
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hemptech Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Craig A. Huffman
13046 Racetrack Road #243
Tampa, FL 33626 |
|
Plaintiff
John F. Graham, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
misc
Acknowledgment of District Case Transfer
Thu 03/22 8:45 AM
Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Florida, Middle District as case number 8:18-cv-00686. (lt) |
||
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
82 | 82
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations
Wed 03/21 4:06 PM
ORDER ADOPTING75 Magistrate's Report and Recommendations. ORDER TRANSFERRING case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) |