Colorado District Court
Judge:R Brooke Jackson
Case #: 1:17-cv-01339
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Jun 02, 2017
Terminated:Sep 10, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2017 2:30 AM MST
Defendant
Blazar Technology Solutions LLC
Represented By
Arron Burt Nesbitt
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Linda Jane Knight
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Kayla Dawn Dreyer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Defendant
Jennifer Gallagher
Represented By
Arron Burt Nesbitt
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Linda Jane Knight
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Kayla Dawn Dreyer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Turse
Represented By
Arron Burt Nesbitt
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Linda Jane Knight
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Kayla Dawn Dreyer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Defendant
John Weeber
Represented By
Arron Burt Nesbitt
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Linda Jane Knight
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Kayla Dawn Dreyer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Defendant
Michael Weiland
Represented By
Arron Burt Nesbitt
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Linda Jane Knight
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Kayla Dawn Dreyer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Defendant
Jon Wright
Represented By
Arron Burt Nesbitt
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Linda Jane Knight
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Kayla Dawn Dreyer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, Llp-Denver
contact info
Plaintiff
Alvarez LLC
Represented By
Thomas Drew Leland
Holland & Knight, Llp-Denver
contact info
Maxwell Norman Shaffer
Holland & Knight, Llp-Denver
contact info

GPO Jul 16 2019
ORDER denying 111 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 112 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 113 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/16/19.(jdyne, )

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
168 168 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Thu 09/12 2:49 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to166 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed in this case on 8/27/2019. Text Only Entry (angar, )
Related: [-]