Robles v. The Regents of the University of California, Berkeley et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Claudia Wilken |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03235 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 02, 2017 2:27 AM PST |
Defendant
Margot Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
University of California Police Department
|
|
Defendant
The Regents of the University of California, Berkeley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Coalition to Defend Affirmative Action, Integration, & Immigrant Rights, and Fight for Equality by Any Means Necessary
|
|
Defendant
George Soros
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nancy Pelosi
|
|
Defendant
Janet Napolitano
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raha Mirabdal
|
|
Defendant
Ian Dabney Miller
|
|
Defendant
Monica Lozano
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
In the Name of Humanity, We Refuse to Accept a Fascist America
|
|
Defendant
Andrew Greenwood
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nicholas B. Dirks
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Berkeley Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Burton
|
|
Defendant
Jesse Arreguin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kiara Robles
|
Represented By
|
1. | Trump supporter Kiara Robles files $23M lawsuit against UC Berkley after being pepper-sprayed during riots (washingtontimes.com) |
Submitted Thu 06/08/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Wed 07/12 12:55 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/11 2:43 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Margot Bennett, Nicholas B. Dirks, Monica Lozano, Janet Napolitano, The Regents of the University of California, Berkeley.. (Phillips, Bradley) (Filed on 7/11/2017) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 07/06 4:17 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by George Soros (Roman, Stanley) (Filed on 7/6/2017) |
|
41 | 41
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 07/06 11:40 AM
STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by Jesse Arreguin, City of Berkeley Police Department, Andrew Greenwood. (Bourgault, Lynne) (Filed on 7/6/2017) |
|
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/06 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lynne Sarah Bourgault (Bourgault, Lynne) (Filed on 7/6/2017) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/05 2:48 PM
ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 36 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017) |
|
38 | 38
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/05 2:47 PM
ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 35 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017) |
|
37 | 37
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/05 2:46 PM
ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 34 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017) |
|
36 | 36
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/05 11:41 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11520738.) filed by George Soros.(Hanrahan, Andrew) (Filed on 7/5/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
35 | 35
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/05 11:38 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11520711.) filed by George Soros.(McCallen, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/5/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
34 | 34
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/05 11:32 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11520691.) filed by George Soros.(Baio, Joseph) (Filed on 7/5/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Fri 06/30 10:16 AM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by George Soros. (Roman, Stanley) (Filed on 6/30/2017) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Thu 06/29 12:25 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Margot Bennett, Nicholas B. Dirks, Monica Lozano, Janet Napolitano, The Regents of the University of California, Berkeley (Phillips, Bradley) (Filed on 6/29/2017) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 06/29 12:05 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND filed by Margot Bennett, Nicholas B. Dirks, Monica Lozano, Janet Napolitano, The Regents of the University of California, Berkeley. (Phillips, Bradley) (Filed on 6/29/2017) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/29 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley S. Phillips , Bryan H. Heckenlively and Elizabeth A. Kim (Phillips, Bradley) (Filed on 6/29/2017) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 06/07 2:30 PM
ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 8 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
28 | 28
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Andrew Greenwood. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
27 | 27
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:39 PM
Summons Issued as to The Coalition to Defend Affirmative Action, Integration, & Immigrant Rights, and Fight for Equality by Any Means Necessary. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
26 | 26
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:36 PM
Summons Issued as to City of Berkeley Police Department. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
25 | 25
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:33 PM
Summons Issued as to George Soros. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
24 | 24
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:31 PM
Summons Issued as to Ian Dabney Miller. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
23 | 23
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Janet Napolitano. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
22 | 22
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:26 PM
Summons Issued as to Jesse Arreguin. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
21 | 21
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:23 PM
Summons Issued as to John Burton. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
20 | 20
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Margot Bennett. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
19 | 19
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Monica Lozano. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:17 PM
Summons Issued as to Nancy Pelosi. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Nicholas B. Dirks. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:12 PM
Summons Issued as to Raha Mirabdal. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:09 PM
Summons Issued as to In the Name of Humanity, We Refuse to Accept a Fascist America. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:07 PM
Summons Issued as to The Regents of the University of California, Berkeley. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/07 12:04 PM
Summons Issued as to University of California Police Department. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 06/06 3:54 PM
Proposed Summons.(Kolodzi, Michael) (Filed on 6/6/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Summons | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/06 1:54 PM
ERRONEOUSLY PROCESSED: PLEASE DISREGARD Summons Issued as to Nicholas B. Dirks. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017) Modified on 6/6/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/06 1:52 PM
ERRONEOUSLY PROCESSED: PLEASE DISREGARD Summons Issued as to Raha Mirabdal. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017) Modified on 6/6/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/06 1:49 PM
ERRONEOUSLY PROCESSED: PLEASE DISREGARD Summons Issued as to In the Name of Humanity, We Refuse to Accept a Fascist America. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017) Modified on 6/6/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/06 1:48 PM
Amended4 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11448082.) Filing fee previously paid on 6/6/2017 filed by Kiara Robles. (Klayman, Larry) (Filed on 6/6/2017) Modified on 6/6/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/06 1:46 PM
ERRONEOUSLY PROCESSED: PLEASE DISREGARD Summons Issued as to The Regents of the University of California, Berkeley. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017) Modified on 6/6/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/06 1:44 PM
ERRONEOUSLY PROCESSED: PLEASE DISREGARD Summons Issued as to University of California Police Department. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017) Modified on 6/6/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 06/06 1:41 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/29/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/5/2017 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/6/17. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/06 11:41 AM
ERRONEOUS E-FILING MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11448082.) filed by Kiara Robles. (Klayman, Larry) (Filed on 6/6/2017) Modified on 6/6/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 06/06 9:53 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/20/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 06/06 1:38 PM
Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Please reference Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11448082. In the new e-filing of this application ) filed by Kiara Robles Applicant is Unidentifiable (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017) |
||
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 06/06 2:17 PM
Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:2 Proposed Summons, filed by Kiara Robles All Information for Proposed Summons are Incomplete. Please Provide/Include Plaintiff Attorneys' Information on Proposed Summons Form. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017) |
||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 06/05 5:26 PM
Proposed Summons.(Kolodzi, Michael) (Filed on 6/5/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Summons | ||
1 | 1
37
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/05 5:19 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11446431.). Filed byKiara Robles.(Kolodzi, Michael) (Filed on 6/5/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |