Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-04140
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2017
Terminated:Jul 26, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By
Branch Banking and Trust Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
6 6 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 07/26 9:27 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:26 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2017
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 07/25 4:32 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 06/06 12:16 PM
Summons and notice issued to Branch Banking and Trust Company Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, June 05, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 06/05 9:12 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-04140 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26358169, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 06/05 7:51 PM
Adversary case 17-04140 Complaint against Branch Banking and Trust Company filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1