Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-04144
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2017
Terminated:Jun 14, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dan S. Dunham
Represented By
Dan S. Dunham
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
6 6 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:26 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
5 5 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 06/14 12:28 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
4 4 misc Statement Wed 06/07 5:22 AM
Statement of Withdrawal of Complaint to Avoid and Recover Avoidable Transfers Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Tue 06/06 12:21 PM
Summons and notice issued to Dan S. Dunham Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, June 05, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 06/05 9:12 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-04144 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26358169, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 06/05 9:01 PM
Adversary case 17-04144 Complaint against Dan S. Dunham filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1