Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Case #: 3:17-cv-00093
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2017
Terminated:Mar 21, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Dec 03, 2017 4:12 AM EST
Defendant
MATTHEW T AMABILE
Represented By
ERNEST V HARRIS
contact info
Defendant
DIXIE ATHENS ENTERPRISES INC
Represented By
ERNEST V HARRIS
contact info
Defendant
DIXIE PAINTING AND MAINTENANCE CONTRACTORS INC
Represented By
ERNEST V HARRIS
contact info
Plaintiff
DIVERSIFIED LENDERS LLC
Represented By
Aaron M. Kappler
contact info
JACKIE L HILL, JR
contact info
SARAH HANNAH NEWMAN
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 21, 2018
18 18 order Judgment Wed 03/21 5:07 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of DIVERSIFIED LENDERS LLC against DIXIE ATHENS ENTERPRISES INC. (ggs)
Related: [-]
17 17 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment Wed 03/21 4:21 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Richard Jackson Allen, III is added as a party Defendant to this case. Defendant Matthew T. Amabile is dismissed, with prejudice. Defendant Dixie Painting and Maintenance Contractors, Inc. (Dixie Painting) is dismissed, without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have judgment against Defendant Dixie Athens Enterprises, Inc. This case shall be administratively closed, unless and until Plaintiff petitions this Court to reopen this matter pursuant to Paragraph 7 of this Order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 3/21/2018. (ggs)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Approve Consent Judgment Wed 03/21 2:21 PM
JOINT MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by DIVERSIFIED LENDERS LLC filed by Aaron M. Kappler.(Kappler, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - proposed Consent Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 03/21 4:09 PM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF Pretrial Conference - Following the Joint Motion for Approval of Consent Judgment16 , the pretrial conference in this case set for 9:00 am 4/5/2018 in Athens, Georgia is hereby CANCELLED, as are all associated deadlines. Additionally, this case is removed from the Athens trial calendar set to commence 5/7/2018. (esl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 07, 2018
15 15 notice Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 03/07 2:36 PM
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2018 09:00 AM in Athens before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/29/2018.(esl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - required format
Friday, August 11, 2017
14 14 order Scheduling/Discovery Order Fri 08/11 12:29 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER :Discovery to be complete by 12/28/2017. Dispositive motions due by 2/12/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 8/11/2017. (esl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
13 13 order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Tue 07/18 9:52 AM
CONSENT ORDER regarding5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/18/2017. (esl)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing Tue 07/18 9:55 AM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MOTION HEARING - Pursuant to Order13 , the hearing re: motion for preliminary injunction scheduled for 2:00 pm, July 19, 2017, in ATHENS is hereby CANCELLED. (esl)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2017
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 07/14 12:17 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by JACKIE L HILL, JR on behalf of DIVERSIFIED LENDERS LLC Attorney JACKIE L HILL, JR added to party DIVERSIFIED LENDERS LLC(pty:pla) (HILL, JACKIE)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2017
11 11 order Order - Rules 16/26 Mon 07/03 8:59 AM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/17/2017. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/3/2017. (esl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2017
10 10 respm Response to Motion Thu 06/29 2:48 PM
RESPONSE filed by MATTHEW T AMABILE, DIXIE ATHENS ENTERPRISES INC, DIXIE PAINTING AND MAINTENANCE CONTRACTORS INC re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (HARRIS, ERNEST)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/29 2:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DIVERSIFIED LENDERS LLC identifying Corporate Parent Diversified Lenders, INC. for DIVERSIFIED LENDERS LLC. (Kappler, Aaron)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 06/29 9:55 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MATTHEW T AMABILE, DIXIE ATHENS ENTERPRISES INC, DIXIE PAINTING AND MAINTENANCE CONTRACTORS INC (HARRIS, ERNEST)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Thu 06/29 8:30 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Pursuant to Local Rule 87, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement - Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. (ggs)
Related: [-] 7 Answer to Complaint, filed by DIXIE PAINTING AND MAINTENANCE CONTRACTORS INC, DIXIE ATHENS ENTERPRISES INC, MATTHEW T AMABILE
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/28 4:35 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by MATTHEW T AMABILE, DIXIE ATHENS ENTERPRISES INC, DIXIE PAINTING AND MAINTENANCE CONTRACTORS INC.(HARRIS, ERNEST)Attorney ERNEST V HARRIS added to party MATTHEW T AMABILE(pty:dft), Attorney ERNEST V HARRIS added to party DIXIE ATHENS ENTERPRISES INC(pty:dft), Attorney ERNEST V HARRIS added to party DIXIE PAINTING AND MAINTENANCE CONTRACTORS INC(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2017
6 6 service Acknowledgment of Service Mon 06/19 3:24 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Dixie Athens Enterprises, Inc., Dixie Painting and Maintenance Contractors, Inc., and Matthew T. Amabile Acknowledgment filed by DIVERSIFIED LENDERS LLC. (Kappler, Aaron) Modified on 6/19/2017 (ggs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 06/13 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2017 02:00 PM in Athens before US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND. (esl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2017
5 5 motion Preliminary Injunction Fri 06/09 3:25 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by DIVERSIFIED LENDERS LLC filed by Aaron M. Kappler.(Kappler, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 06/06 3:02 PM
Summons Issued as to DIXIE PAINTING AND MAINTENANCE CONTRACTORS INC. (ggs)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 06/06 3:00 PM
Summons Issued as to DIXIE ATHENS ENTERPRISES INC. (ggs)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 06/06 2:58 PM
Summons Issued as to MATTHEW T AMABILE. (ggs)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Complaint Tue 06/06 2:38 PM
COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Diversified Lenders, LLC Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2628033, $400 filed by Diversified Lenders, LLC(Kappler, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1_UCC 6 27-2013
Att: 2 Exhibit 2_UCC 11 18-2014
Att: 3 Exhibit 3_Journal Entry of Judgment,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4_Order Domesticating Judgment,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5_Dixie Athens Articles of Incorporation,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6_Dixie Athens Transmittal Information,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7_Dixie Painting Annual Registration,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8_Bill of Sale,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 10 Summons Matthew T. Amabile,
Att: 11 Summons Dixie Athens Enterprises, Inc.,
Att: 12 Summons Dixie Painting and Maintenance Contractors, Inc.