Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Arthur J Tarnow
Referred: Mona K Majzoub
Case #: 2:17-cv-11794
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2017
Terminated:Jul 19, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Dec 03, 2017 4:17 AM EST
Defendant
Detroit World Outreach Church
Defendant
Dr. Charisse Gibert
Represented By
Khalilah V. Spencer
Honigman Miller Schwartz And Cohn LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By
William S. Cook
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, July 19, 2017
11 11 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Wed 07/19 2:11 PM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2017
10 10 misc Stipulation Mon 07/17 9:10 AM
STIPULATION of the Parties for an Order of Discharge, Distribution of Funds and Dismissal with Prejudice by American General Life Insurance Company (Cook, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/28 5:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses DEFENDANT CHARISSE GIBERTS ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER AND DECLARATORY RELIEF by Dr. Charisse Gibert. (Spencer, Khalilah)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance Wed 06/28 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Khalilah V. Spencer on behalf of Dr. Charisse Gibert. (Spencer, Khalilah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2017
7 7 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/22 12:40 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Dr. Charisse Gibert served on 6/7/2017, answer due 6/28/2017. (Cook, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Thu 06/22 11:23 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Detroit World Outreach Church served on 6/5/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (Cook, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
5 5 service Summons Issued* Wed 06/07 1:15 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Dr. Charisse Gibert* (LGra)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued* Wed 06/07 1:15 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Detroit World Outreach Church* (LGra)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 06/07 1:14 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LGra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
3 3 motion Deposit Funds Tue 06/06 3:24 PM
MOTION to Deposit Funds by American General Life Insurance Company. (Cook, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit a-Order Granting Motion to Deposit Funds
2 2 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 06/06 3:01 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by American General Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent AGC Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent SAFG Retirement Services, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Life Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. (AIG) for American General Life Insurance Company. (Cook, William)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 06/06 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT Interpleader Complaint filed by American General Life Insurance Company against Detroit World Outreach Church, Dr. Charisse Gibert. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6256410 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Houston, Texas - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): Wayne County Circuit Court, 17-004663-CA, Judge Annette Berry ] (Cook, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-American General Life Insurance Application,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-American General Amendment of Application/Policy,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3-True & correct specimen of Policy,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4-True & correct copy of DWO's Proof of Death Claimant Statement,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5-True & correct Proof of Death Claimant's Statement signed by Dr. Gibert,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6-True & correct copy of Dr. Gibert's letter dated 04/12/17,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7-True & correct copy of American General's records reflecting the 2013 and 2015 loans and the 2016 Annual Statement reflecting the balance of the 2013 and 2015 loans,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8-True & correct copy of the letter sent to Decedent transmitting the $23,000.00 loan check on December 16, 2016