JCS Development, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-33555 |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 10, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 5,001-10,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned
Tue 10/17 9:58 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated (DawnaKelly) |
||
Tuesday, December 10, 2019 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 09/30 2:44 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (emiller) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Submitted
Wed 06/14 1:56 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of Social Security Number Filed. Does this document change the social security number for one or more debtors?. Has the Meeting of Creditors been set in this case?. (mmap) |
|
Saturday, June 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 06/10 11:58 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/10/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 06/10 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
No Creditor Mailing List
Thu 06/08 4:55 PM
No Creditor Mailing List (ShoshanaArnow) |
|
5 | 5
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Thu 06/08 6:30 AM
|
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Document
Wed 06/07 9:18 AM
An Order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Ignite Restaurant Group, Inc., Case No 17-33550 Ignite Restaurant Group RSC LLC, Case No 17-33551 Joes Crab Shack, LLC, Case No. 17-33552 Joes Crab Shack Maryland, LLC, Case No. 17-33553 JCS Monmouth Mall NJ, LLC, Case No. 17-33554 JCS Development, LLC, Case No. 17-33555 Joes Crab Shack Redondo Beach, Inc., Case No. 17-33556 Joes Crab Shack Anne Arundel MD, LLC, Case No. 17-33557 BHTT Entertainment, LLC, Case No. 17-33558 Brick House Development, LLC 17-33559 and Ignite Restaurants New Jersey, LLC, Case No. 17-33561 All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 17-33550 (aalo) |
|
court
Case Reassigned
Wed 06/07 8:52 AM
Judge David R Jones added to case. Involvement of Judge Marvin Isgur Terminated (aalo) |
||
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 06/07 10:39 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Hector Duran (Duran, Hector) |
||
trustee
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 06/07 10:59 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stephen Douglas Statham (Statham, Stephen) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Emergency
Wed 06/07 9:13 AM
Order Directing Joint Administration Signed on 6/6/2017. (aalo) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Emergency Motion
Tue 06/06 7:22 AM
Emergency Motion /Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor JCS Development, LLC (Ripley, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
1 | 1
6
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Tue 06/06 6:04 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by JCS Development, LLC. (Ripley, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Corporate Ownership Statement | ||
Att: 2 List of Equity Security Holders | ||
Att: 3 Resolutions | ||
Att: 4 List of 30 Largest Unsecured Creditors | ||
crditcrd
none
Tue 06/06 2:23 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-33555 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 187165. Fee amount $1717.00. (gclair) |