Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-33550

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:17-bk-33552
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2017
Terminated:Dec 10, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
court Case Reassigned Tue 10/17 9:57 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 09/30 2:26 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (emiller)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
16 16 misc Creditor Request for Notices Tue 05/15 4:06 PM
Creditor Request for Notices (Filed By Office of Unemployment Compensation Tax Services ). (LaurenWebster)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2018
15 15 misc Notice of Change of Address Mon 05/07 3:29 PM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Arizona Department of Revenue (Vcan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 20, 2018
14 14 claims Withdrawal of Claim Fri 04/20 8:32 AM
Withdrawal of Claim: 88 (Jarreau, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
13 13 claims Withdrawal of Claim Mon 03/12 2:33 PM
Withdrawal of Claim: 32 (Willey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2017
12 12 claims Withdrawal of Claim Thu 10/05 7:20 AM
Withdrawal of Claim: 34 (Jarreau, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2017
11 11 court Letter Tue 07/11 11:59 AM
DOCKETED IN ERROR, REFILED IN CASE 17-33550 Letter Regarding Payment by Jeffrey L Jackson (gkel) Modified on 7/11/2017 (gkel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2017
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 06/16 11:11 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kathleen Horne Filed by on behalf of TM4 LLC (dgon)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 06/16 11:09 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Kathleen Horne . Filed by Creditor TM4 LLC (dgon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
8 8 court Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of SSN Submitted Wed 06/14 1:54 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing and Statement of Social Security Number Filed. Does this document change the social security number for one or more debtors?. Has the Meeting of Creditors been set in this case?. (mmap)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/10 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/09/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order on Emergency Motion
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/10 12:05 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/09/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Thursday, June 08, 2017
court Notice of Duplicate Case Filing Thu 06/08 1:39 PM
Previous case filed in the Central District of California, Case Number 00-15343 (Olin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
5 5 court Document Wed 06/07 9:17 AM
An Order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of Texas directing joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Ignite Restaurant Group, Inc., Case No 17-33550 Ignite Restaurant Group RSC LLC, Case No 17-33551 Joes Crab Shack, LLC, Case No. 17-33552 Joes Crab Shack Maryland, LLC, Case No. 17-33553 JCS Monmouth Mall NJ, LLC, Case No. 17-33554 JCS Development, LLC, Case No. 17-33555 Joes Crab Shack Redondo Beach, Inc., Case No. 17-33556 Joes Crab Shack Anne Arundel MD, LLC, Case No. 17-33557 BHTT Entertainment, LLC, Case No. 17-33558 Brick House Development, LLC 17-33559 and Ignite Restaurants New Jersey, LLC, Case No. 17-33561 All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed in and all further docket entries shall be made in Case No. 17-33550 (aalo)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists Wed 06/07 6:30 AM
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 06/07 10:37 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Hector Duran (Duran, Hector)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 06/07 10:57 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Stephen Douglas Statham (Statham, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
4 4 order Emergency Wed 06/07 9:11 AM
Order Directing Joint Administration Related [+] Signed on 6/6/2017. (aalo)
Related: [-] 2
2 2 motion Emergency Motion Tue 06/06 7:19 AM
Emergency Motion /Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Debtor Joe's Crab Shack, LLC (Ripley, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Tue 06/06 5:34 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Joe's Crab Shack, LLC. (Ripley, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corporate Ownership Statement
Att: 2 List of Equity Security Holders
Att: 3 Resolutions
Att: 4 List of 30 Largest Unsecured Creditors
crditcrd none Tue 06/06 2:23 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-33552 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 187165. Fee amount $1717.00. (gclair)
Related: [-]