Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-04181
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2017
Terminated:Nov 06, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Soundside Healthcare, PC
Represented By
Soundside Healthcare, PC
contact info
Defendant
William C. Rawls, Jr.
Represented By
William C. Rawls, Jr.
contact info
Defendant
Maribeth Pollock Loynes
Represented By
Maribeth Pollock Loynes
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Friday, November 06, 2020
19 19 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Fri 11/06 11:11 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
18 18 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 11/04 9:33 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
17 17 order Directing Tue 06/30 10:42 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney; Cullen Drescher Speckhart terminated; Robert S. Westermann for Richard Arrowsmith added (Motion filed in 15-32919 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2019
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/04 8:31 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Joshua David Stiff of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-] related document(s)15 Order on Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney
Monday, October 28, 2019
15 15 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Mon 10/28 9:25 AM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Related [+]Diana L.C. McGraw terminated; (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] 14
Thursday, October 10, 2019
14 14 motion Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Thu 10/10 4:51 PM
Notice and Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney -Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel Related [+] . (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-] -Docketed to Include Certificate of Service
Thursday, October 03, 2019
13 13 motion Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Thu 10/03 1:38 PM
Notice and Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney -Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel . (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Thu 10/03 12:11 PM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw. (Stiff, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/20 10:14 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 07, 2018
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/07 8:49 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,9 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
9 9 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/07 8:17 AM
Alias Summons and notice issued to William C. Rawls, Jr. ; Soundside Healthcare, PC Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
8 8 misc Request for Alias Summons Wed 06/06 9:40 AM
Request for Alias Summons for Soundside Healthcare, PC and William C. Rawls, Jr. filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 05, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 06/05 1:56 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding of Defendant Maribeth Pollock Loynes filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2017
6 6 answer None Fri 12/22 12:13 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Joseph E.H. Atkinson of Hancock, Daniel, Johnson, and Nagle on behalf of Maribeth Pollock Loynes. (Atkinson, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:26 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/21 12:32 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Wed 06/07 12:31 PM
Summons and notice issued to Maribeth Pollock Loynes ; William C. Rawls, Jr. ; Soundside Healthcare, PC Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 06/06 3:42 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-04181 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26366576, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 06/06 3:19 PM
Adversary case 17-04181 Complaint against Soundside Healthcare, PC, William C. Rawls, Jr., Maribeth Pollock Loynes filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2