Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-04199
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2017
Terminated:Aug 29, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cardiology Center, LLC
Represented By
Cardiology Center, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Carlos O. Rodriguez-Fierro
Represented By
Carlos O. Rodriguez-Fierro
contact info
Defendant
Sanjay G. Dravid
Represented By
Sanjay G. Dravid
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
11 11 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 08/29 8:26 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
10 10 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 08/28 2:29 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
9 9 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Wed 11/15 10:42 AM
Notice of Motion to Dismiss Complaint Related [+] filed by Jonathan A. Grasso of Pierce McCoy, PLLC on behalf of Cardiology Center, LLC. (Grasso, Jonathan)
Related: [-] related document(s)8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Cardiology Center, LLC
8 8 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/15 10:41 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Jonathan A. Grasso of Pierce McCoy, PLLC on behalf of Cardiology Center, LLC. (Grasso, Jonathan)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, November 14, 2017
7 7 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 11/14 10:52 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Sanjay G. Dravid filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2017
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 11/10 8:56 AM
Stipulation to Extend Answer Deadline By Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee and Between Sanjay G. Dravid filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:26 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/15 2:19 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Order
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Wed 06/07 12:54 PM
Summons and notice issued to Cardiology Center, LLC ; Sanjay G. Dravid ; Carlos O. Rodriguez-Fierro Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, June 06, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 06/06 11:22 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-04199 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26369033, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 06/06 9:35 PM
Adversary case 17-04199 Complaint against Cardiology Center, LLC, Carlos O. Rodriguez-Fierro, Sanjay G. Dravid filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3