Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-04238
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2017
Terminated:Sep 12, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
FLORES & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Represented By
FLORES & ASSOCIATES, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, September 12, 2019
42 42 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 09/12 8:24 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
41 41 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 09/11 10:44 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
40 40 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/10 10:47 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
39 39 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Fri 06/14 9:25 AM
Consent Order Granting Motion to Vacate Default Judgment Entered Against Flores & Associates, LLC Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] 31
Thursday, April 25, 2019
38 38 court Hearing held Thu 04/25 1:32 PM
Hearing held; Resolved; Consent Order to be submitted Related [+] Appearance: Franklin Cragle. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)29 Garnishment Summons
Thursday, April 11, 2019
37 37 misc Stipulation Thu 04/11 6:03 PM
Stipulation to Extend Response Deadline By Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee and Between Flores & Associates, LLC filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2019
36 36 misc Stipulation Mon 03/18 5:22 PM
Stipulation to Extend Response Deadline By Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee and Between Flores & Associates, LLC filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2019
35 35 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Fri 03/01 11:48 AM
Notice of Motion Related [+] filed by Lisa P. Sumner of Nexsen Pruet on behalf of FLORES & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Sumner, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)31 Motion to Vacate filed by FLORES & ASSOCIATES, LLC
34 34 court 4 - Inquiry/General Checksheet Request Fri 03/01 7:58 AM
Inquiry/General Checksheet Issued to Lisa Sumner regarding Motion, Notice of Hearing; notice of motion omitted. Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)31 Motion to Vacate filed by FLORES & ASSOCIATES, LLC
Thursday, February 28, 2019
33 33 court Hearing continued Thu 02/28 11:14 AM
Hearing continued; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)29 Garnishment Summons
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
32 32 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 02/27 12:00 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Corporate Parents added to case: CENTURY EQUITY PARTNERS. filed by Lisa P. Sumner of Nexsen Pruet on behalf of FLORES & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Sumner, Lisa)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Vacate Wed 02/27 9:59 AM
Motion to Vacate Related [+] filed by Lisa P. Sumner of Nexsen Pruet on behalf of FLORES & ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Sumner, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)10 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - Affidavit of Mario J. Flores, Jr.
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B - Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint to Avoid and Recover Avoidable Transfers
Tuesday, January 22, 2019
30 30 misc Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal Tue 01/22 4:51 PM
Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
29 29 summon Garnishment Summons (HDL) Tue 01/22 4:50 PM
Garnishment Summons; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 2/28/2019 at 10:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)28 Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
28 28 misc Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment Tue 01/22 4:49 PM
Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment -Flores & Associates, LLC filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 30, 2018
27 27 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Sat 12/01 12:30 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)25 Order Directing
26 26 court BNC certificate of mailing of order Sat 12/01 12:30 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)24 Order Directing
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
25 25 order Directing Wed 11/28 10:38 AM
Garnishment Disposition Order Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Garnishment Summons,15 Garnishment Summons
24 24 order Directing Wed 11/28 10:33 AM
Garnishment Disposition Order Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Garnishment Summons,15 Garnishment Summons
Thursday, November 22, 2018
23 23 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript Fri 11/23 12:42 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s)22 Transcript filed
Monday, November 19, 2018
22 22 court Transcript filed Mon 11/19 11:00 AM
Transcript filed Re: Hearing Held 11/15/2018, Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 02/17/2019. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, Telephone number 973-406-2250.] [Transcript Purchased by Cullen Speckhart.] Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/26/2018. Redaction Request Due By 12/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/20/2018. Transcript access will be restricted through 02/17/2019. (Gottlieb, Jason)
Related: [-] 21 Hearing held; Requested Relief Granted (Re: related document(s)12 Garnishment Summons,15 Garnishment Summons) Appearance: Franklin Cragle.
Thursday, November 15, 2018
21 21 court Hearing held Thu 11/15 11:13 AM
Hearing held; Requested Relief Granted Related [+] Appearance: Franklin Cragle. (Oliver, Betty)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Garnishment Summons,15 Garnishment Summons
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
20 20 misc Statement Wed 11/14 5:32 PM
Statement Garnishee Answer to Garnishment Summons Related [+] filed by Ethan G. Ostroff of Troutman Sanders LLP on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A..(Ostroff, Ethan)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Garnishment Summons,15 Garnishment Summons
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
Tuesday, November 13, 2018
19 19 answer Answer Wed 11/14 12:58 PM
Answer -Garnishee's Answer Related [+] filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)15 Garnishment Summons
Wednesday, September 05, 2018
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/05 11:38 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by US Marshals Service. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)15 Garnishment Summons,16 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/05 11:37 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by US Marshals Service. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Garnishment Summons,13 Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Monday, August 20, 2018
16 16 misc Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal Mon 08/20 10:40 AM
Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
15 15 summon Garnishment Summons (HDL) Mon 08/20 10:39 AM
Garnishment Summons; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)14 Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
14 14 misc Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment Mon 08/20 10:38 AM
Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment - Flores & Associates, LLC filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal Mon 08/20 10:37 AM
Writ of Execution to the U.S. Marshal filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
12 12 summon Garnishment Summons (HDL) Mon 08/20 10:36 AM
Garnishment Summons; Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)11 Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
11 11 misc Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment Mon 08/20 10:35 AM
Suggestion for Summons in Garnishment - Flores & Associates, LLC filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 06, 2018
10 10 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Mon 08/06 9:02 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, August 02, 2018
9 9 misc Certification Thu 08/02 2:27 PM
Amended Certification of No Objection Regarding Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,7 Notice of Motion filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
8 8 misc Certification Thu 08/02 2:08 PM
Certification of No Objection Regarding Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,7 Notice of Motion filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Thursday, July 05, 2018
7 7 notice Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Thu 07/05 11:47 AM
Notice of Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Motion for Entry of Default filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
6 6 motion Entry of Default Thu 07/05 11:46 AM
Motion for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/26 10:45 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
4 4 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:33 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/08 9:55 AM
Summons and notice issued to FLORES & ASSOCIATES, LLC Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 06/07 1:30 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-04238 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26369408, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/07 12:47 AM
Adversary case 17-04238 Complaint against FLORES & ASSOCIATES, LLC filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1