Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-04240
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2017
Terminated:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
HALFPENNY TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By
HALFPENNY TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
10 10 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 11/20 9:37 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Stehle, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 11/19 11:27 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Kollin Geoffrey Bender of Hirschler Fleischer, P.C. on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Bender, Kollin)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Tuesday, June 30, 2020
8 8 order Directing Tue 06/30 10:53 PM
Order Granting Motion to Substitute or Withdraw Attorney; Cullen Drescher Speckhart terminated; Robert S. Westermann for Richard Arrowsmith added (Motion filed in 15-32919 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/10 3:11 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/26 12:46 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
5 5 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:33 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2017
4 4 answer None Mon 07/10 2:12 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by John E. Lucian of Blank Rome LLP on behalf of HALFPENNY TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Lucian, John)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, June 08, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/08 9:57 AM
Summons and notice issued to HALFPENNY TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 06/07 1:30 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-04240 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26369408, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/07 12:52 AM
Adversary case 17-04240 Complaint against HALFPENNY TECHNOLOGIES, INC. filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1