Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-04242
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2017
Terminated:Sep 13, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
KANSAS DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Represented By
KANSAS DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
7 7 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 09/13 11:01 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 09/12 3:32 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/26 10:50 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
4 4 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:33 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/08 10:00 AM
Summons and notice issued to KANSAS DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 06/07 1:30 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-04242 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26369408, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/07 12:57 AM
Adversary case 17-04242 Complaint against KANSAS DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1