Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-04244
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2017
Terminated:Jun 14, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
ONCIMMUNE (USA) LLC
Represented By
ONCIMMUNE (USA) LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
6 6 misc Withdrawal of Appearance (one pdf) Wed 07/26 9:33 AM
Withdrawal of Appearance by Jennifer T. Langley. (Langley, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
5 5 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 06/14 10:35 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 06/13 12:20 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/08 10:03 AM
Summons and notice issued to ONCIMMUNE (USA) LLC Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 06/07 1:30 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-04244 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26369408, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/07 1:02 AM
Adversary case 17-04244 Complaint against ONCIMMUNE (USA) LLC filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1