Campbell et al v. Facebook Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Phyllis J Hamilton |
Case #: | 5:13-cv-05996 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2013 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 25, 2014 6:52 PM PST |
Defendant
Facebook Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Hurley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Shadpour
|
Represented By
|
1. | Facebook must face lawsuit over scanning of users' messages: judge (reuters.com) |
Submitted Fri 12/26/2014 | |
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 24, 2014 | ||
44 | 44 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. You are hereby notified that a case management conference will be held on February 26, 2015. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2015. Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2015 02:00 PM. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE)(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2014) | |
Tuesday, December 23, 2014 | ||
43 | 43 ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014) | |
Thursday, October 09, 2014 | ||
42 | 42 STIPULATION Regarding Judicially Noticeable Documents filed by Facebook Inc. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 10/9/2014) Modified on 10/10/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/10/2014 (kk, COURT STAFF). | |
Wednesday, October 01, 2014 | ||
41 | 41 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 10/1/2014) | |
40 | 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Facebook Inc. for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 10/1/2014) | |
39 | 39 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/1/2014 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 10/1/2014) re29 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/1/2014) | |
Monday, September 22, 2014 | ||
38 | 38 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byFacebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 9/22/2014) | |
Thursday, September 04, 2014 | ||
37 | 37 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. You are hereby notified that the September 17, 2014 hearing is continued to October 1, 2014, Set/Reset Deadlines as to29 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2014 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE)(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014) | |
Thursday, August 28, 2014 | ||
36 | 36 Reply in Support of re33 Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint by Facebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). | |
35 | 35 REPLY filed byFacebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 8/28/2014) | |
Tuesday, August 19, 2014 | ||
34 | 34 NOTICE of Recent Decision by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour.(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 8/19/2014) Modified on 8/20/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, July 30, 2014 | ||
33 | 33 RESPONSE filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2014) Modified on 7/31/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). | |
32 | 32 Request for Judicial Notice re31 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2014) | |
31 | 31 RESPONSE filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour.(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 7/30/2014) | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael W. Sobol, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D | ||
Tuesday, June 17, 2014 | ||
30 | 30 Request for Judicial Notice re29 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byFacebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2014) | |
29 | 29 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 7/30/2014. Replies due by 8/28/2014.(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2014) | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeremy Jordan and Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss | ||
Wednesday, June 11, 2014 | ||
28 | 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 6/11/2014) | |
Monday, June 09, 2014 | ||
27 | 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 26 Stipulation.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014) | |
Friday, June 06, 2014 | ||
26 | 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Facebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (vlkS, COURT STAFF). | |
Friday, April 25, 2014 | ||
25 | 25 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, against Facebook Inc.. Filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley, David Shadpour. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/25/2014) Modified on 4/28/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). | |
Tuesday, April 15, 2014 | ||
24 | 24 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 18 Motion to Consolidate Cases.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014) | |
Friday, April 11, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 REPLY Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion to Consolidate Related Actions and Appoint Interim Class Counsel filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2014) | |
Friday, April 04, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 RESPONSE Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Related Actions and Appoint Interim Counsel filed byFacebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 4/4/2014) | |
Wednesday, March 26, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 Letter from Nicholas Diamand re Dckt Nos.19 & 20 . (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/26/2014) | |
20 | 20 Renotice motion hearing re18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 13-CV-05996 and 14-CV-00307 13-5996 PJH 19 > 20 Correction of filing error of Docket No. 19 filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 4/7/2014. Replies due by 4/14/2014. (Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/26/2014) | |
Monday, March 24, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Counsel filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 4/7/2014. Replies due by 4/14/2014. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 3/24/2014) | |
Friday, March 21, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 13-CV-05996 and 14-CV-00307 filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. Responses due by 4/4/2014. Replies due by 4/11/2014.(Gardner, Melissa) (Filed on 3/21/2014) | |
Att: 1 Declaration Michael W. Sobol, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Sobol Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Hank Bates, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Bates Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration Jeremy Lieberman, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit A to Lieberman Declaration, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 11, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' FILING OF CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RELATED CASE DEADLINES AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting (16) Stipulation in case 4:13-cv-05996-PJH; granting (12) Stipulation in case 4:14-cv-00307-PJH (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014) | |
Thursday, March 06, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Filing Of Consolidated Amended Complaint And Related Case Deadlines, filed by Facebook Inc., Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 3/6/2014) Modified on 3/7/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). | |
Monday, February 03, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 ORDER RELATING CASE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 14 Motion to Relate Case. C 13-5996 PJH AND C 14-307 PSG ARE RELATED. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014) | |
Wednesday, January 29, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Facebook Inc..(Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 1/29/2014) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, January 15, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 STIPULATION To Extend Time For Defendant Facebook, Inc. To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook Inc.. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 1/15/2014) | |
12 | 12 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook Inc. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 1/15/2014) | |
11 | 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Aaron Jessen Notice Of Appearance Of Counsel For Defendant Facebook, Inc. (Jessen, Joshua) (Filed on 1/15/2014) | |
Friday, January 10, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Rachel Geman.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014) | |
9 | 9 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas Diamand.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014) | |
Tuesday, January 07, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8276841.) filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley.(Geman, Rachel) (Filed on 1/7/2014) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
7 | 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8276892.) filed by Matthew Campbell, Michael Hurley.(Diamand, Nicholas) (Filed on 1/7/2014) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to Facebook Inc.. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014) | |
Monday, January 06, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Proposed Summons. (Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 1/6/2014) | |
Monday, December 30, 2013 | ||
4 | 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/27/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/3/2014 02:00 PM. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013) | |
3 | 3 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Hon. Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/30/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013) | |
2 | 2 Case assigned to Hon. Jeremy Fogel. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2013) | |
1 | 1 36 pgs COMPLAINT against Facebook Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8262200.). Filed byMatthew Campbell, Michael Hurley.(Sobol, Michael) (Filed on 12/30/2013) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |