California Eastern District Court
Judge:Anthony W Ishii
Referred: Jennifer L Thurston
Case #: 1:17-cv-00776
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:1981 Housing Discrimination
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2017
Terminated:Feb 08, 2019
Last checked: Sunday Dec 03, 2017 1:05 AM PST
Defendant
Dharam Pal
4015 Ocean Dr.
Oxnard, CA 93035
Represented By
Andre Michael Picciurro
Gordon & Rees
contact info
Defendant
Vijay Pal
4015 Ocean Dr.
Oxnard, CA 93035
Represented By
Andre Michael Picciurro
Gordon & Rees
contact info
Plaintiff
Tanya Morrison
Represented By
Liza Cristol-Deman
Brancart & Brancart
contact info
Mark Alan Roy
Greater Bakersfield Legal Assistance, Inc.
contact info
Bashar Nagi Algabyali
Greater Bakersfield Legal Assistance
contact info
Jina Kim
Greater Bakersfield Legal Assistance
contact info
Plaintiff
Mario Tolls
Represented By
Liza Cristol-Deman
Brancart & Brancart
contact info
Mark Alan Roy
Greater Bakersfield Legal Assistance, Inc.
contact info
Bashar Nagi Algabyali
Greater Bakersfield Legal Assistance
contact info
Jina Kim
Greater Bakersfield Legal Assistance
contact info
Plaintiff
Tanisha Wiley
Represented By
Liza Cristol-Deman
Brancart & Brancart
contact info
Mark Alan Roy
Greater Bakersfield Legal Assistance, Inc.
contact info
Bashar Nagi Algabyali
Greater Bakersfield Legal Assistance
contact info
Jina Kim
Greater Bakersfield Legal Assistance
contact info
Plaintiff
Arissa Dickson Tolls
Represented By
Liza Cristol-Deman
Brancart & Brancart
contact info
Mark Alan Roy
Greater Bakersfield Legal Assistance, Inc.
contact info
Bashar Nagi Algabyali
Greater Bakersfield Legal Assistance
contact info
Jina Kim
Greater Bakersfield Legal Assistance
contact info

GPO Sep 11 2017
18. Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Jury Trial set for 2/5/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/11/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 12/10/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 9/18/2017; Non-Expert 5/4/2018; Expert 7/13/2018. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/20/2018 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 7/27/2018; Hearing by 8/24/2018. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/10/2018; Hearing by 10/22/20
GPO Oct 02 2017
ORDER GRANTING the 14 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Mark Roy and DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to Update the Docket, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/29/2017. Attorney Mark Roy terminated as counsel for plaintiffs. (Hall, S)
GPO Feb 01 2018
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 19, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/1/2018. Stipulated Protective Order is GRANTED; to file documents under seal, the parties SHALL request sealing pursuant to Local Rule 141. (Hall, S)
GPO May 02 2018
ORDER GRANTING 23 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/2/2018. Discovery Deadlines: Non-expert 6/29/2018; Expert 7/20/2018. (Hall, S)
GPO Jul 17 2018
STIPULATION and ORDER 25 for Extension of Expert Discovery and Non-Dispositive Motion Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/17/2018. Expert Discovery completed by 9/1/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/10/2018; Hearing by 10/8/2018. (Hall, S)
GPO Oct 05 2018
ORDER on JOINT APAPLICATION and STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME and SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs' opposition and related documents shall be filed on October 9, 2018. Defendants' reply shall be filed on October 16, 2018. The hearing will take place as previously noticed on October 22, 2018. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/5/2018. (Timken, A)
GPO Dec 10 2018
ants' memorandum of fees and costs. Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment is otherwise DENIED. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/10/2018. (Timken, A)ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, 27. Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED as to the following claims: a) The unlawful rent collection claims (eleventh claim for relief) of Mario Tolls, Arissa Dickson Tolls, and Tanya Lewis; b) The Bane Act claims (fourth claim for relief) of Arissa Dickson Tolls, Tanya Lewis, and Tanisha Wiley. Defendants shall FILE by January 10, 2019, a memorandum of fees and costs with supporting affidavits concerning Defendants' fees and costs expended in relation to the unlawful rent collection claims pleaded by Mario Tolls, Arissa Dickson Tolls, and Tanya Lewis. Plaintiffs may FILE by January 24, 2019, an opposition to Defend
GPO Dec 18 2018
ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference set for 1/7/2019, at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/18/2018. (Timken, A)
GPO Jan 02 2019
ORDER GRANTING 44 Request to Excuse Mario Tolls from Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/2/2019. (Hall, S)
GPO Jan 02 2019
ORDER DENYING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS IN LIMINE, 43. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/2/2019. (Timken, A)
GPO Jan 03 2019
or by facsimile upon opposing counsel. The Pretrial Order's schedule and instructions for oppositions, replies, and the hearing for the motions in limine remain unchanged and in effect. Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATION TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS IN LIMINE. By 4:00 p.m. on January 10, 2019, all motions in limine, with supporting points and authorities, shall be filed and served either personally 3/2019. (Timken, A)
GPO Jan 10 2019
ORDER re: 50 Notice Tentative Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2019. Stipulation for issuance of a consent decree SHALL be filed by 1/31/2019. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings are VACATED. (Hall, S)
GPO Feb 08 2019
CONSENT DECREE AND FINAL ORDER signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/7/2019. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
GPO Apr 03 2019
ORDER Dismissing Case Subject to Terms of Consent Decree and Final Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/02/2019. (Flores, E)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
55 55 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/03 8:02 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case Subject to Terms of Consent Decree and Final Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/02/2019. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2019
54 54 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/01 3:49 PM
STIPULATION of DISMISSAL subject to consent decree by Tanya Morrison, Arissa Dickson Tolls, Mario Tolls, Tanisha Wiley. (Cristol-Deman, Liza)
Related: [-]