Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-04398
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2017
Terminated:Nov 29, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
ROBERT MEGNA
Represented By
ROBERT MEGNA
contact info
Defendant
FERRIS FAMILY MEDICINE, PA
Represented By
FERRIS FAMILY MEDICINE, PA
contact info
Defendant
CAROLYN MILLIGAN
Represented By
CAROLYN MILLIGAN
contact info
Defendant
DAVEY PERRIN
Represented By
DAVEY PERRIN
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Cullen Drescher Speckhart
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, November 29, 2018
9 9 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 11/29 7:01 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 11/28 1:20 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
7 7 misc Mediator Certification of Compliance Tue 05/08 2:51 PM
Mediator Certification of Compliance (Mediator's Report) filed by Peter M. Pearl of Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC on behalf of Peter M. Pearl, Mediator. (Pearl, Peter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
6 6 motion Substitute or Withdraw Attorney Wed 05/02 10:37 AM
Consent Motion to Substitute Attorney filed by Kenneth M. Misken of Miles & Stockbridge, P.C. on behalf of CAROLYN MILLIGAN, DAVEY PERRIN, FERRIS FAMILY MEDICINE, PA, ROBERT MEGNA. (Misken, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 19, 2017
5 5 answer None Thu 10/19 2:33 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Peter J. Barrett of Kutak Rock L.L.P. on behalf of CAROLYN MILLIGAN, DAVEY PERRIN, FERRIS FAMILY MEDICINE, PA, ROBERT MEGNA. (Barrett, Peter)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, June 15, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/15 3:25 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Thursday, June 08, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/08 5:56 PM
Summons and notice issued to CAROLYN MILLIGAN ; DAVEY PERRIN ; FERRIS FAMILY MEDICINE, PA ; ROBERT MEGNA Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 06/07 11:30 PM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-04398 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26379437, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/07 9:48 PM
Adversary case 17-04398 Complaint against ROBERT MEGNA, FERRIS FAMILY MEDICINE, PA, CAROLYN MILLIGAN, DAVEY PERRIN filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5