Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-04401
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2017
Terminated:Sep 11, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mazen Khusayem
Represented By
Mazen Khusayem
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Diana L.C. McGraw
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
7 7 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Tue 09/11 11:29 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 07, 2018
6 6 notice Notice of Dismissal Fri 09/07 12:45 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2017
5 5 answer None Thu 12/21 5:11 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Joseph E.H. Atkinson of Hancock, Daniel, Johnson, and Nagle on behalf of Mazen Khusayem. (Atkinson, Joseph)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, July 21, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/21 1:40 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Thursday, June 08, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/08 6:02 PM
Summons and notice issued to Mazen Khusayem Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 06/08 12:31 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-04401 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26379974, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/07 9:57 PM
Adversary case 17-04401 Complaint against Mazen Khusayem filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2