Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:15-bk-32919

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:17-ap-04438
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2017
Terminated:Sep 13, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cardiology Partners, P.L.
Represented By
Cardiology Partners, P.L.
contact info
Defendant
Chandra Venugopal
Represented By
Chandra Venugopal
contact info
Defendant
Jean Foucauld
Represented By
Jean Foucauld
contact info
Defendant
Amarnath Vedere
Represented By
Amarnath Vedere
contact info
Defendant
Neerav Shah
Represented By
Neerav Shah
contact info
Defendant
Eliezer Hernandez
Represented By
Eliezer Hernandez
contact info
Defendant
Duccio Baldari
Represented By
Duccio Baldari
contact info
Defendant
Mauricio Melhado
Represented By
Mauricio Melhado
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Diana L.C. McGraw
Wolcott Rivers Gates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Friday, September 13, 2019
10 10 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Fri 09/13 9:59 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 09/12 12:08 PM
Notice of Dismissal filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/11 4:21 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Franklin R. Cragle III of Hirschler Fleischer, PC on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (Cragle, Franklin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 02, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 08/02 8:34 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,6 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
6 6 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 08/02 8:15 AM
Alias Summons and notice issued to Duccio Baldari ; Cardiology Partners, P.L. ; Jean Foucauld ; Eliezer Hernandez ; Mauricio Melhado ; Neerav Shah ; Amarnath Vedere ; Chandra Venugopal Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
Wednesday, August 01, 2018
5 5 misc Request for Alias Summons Wed 08/01 11:56 AM
Request for Alias Summons for Cardiology Partners, P.L., Chandra Venugopal, Jean Foucauld, Amarnath Vedere, Neerav Shah, Eliezer Hernandez, Duccio Baldari, and Mauricio Melhado filed by Diana L.C. McGraw of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. (McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/26 9:43 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Cullen Drescher Speckhart of Wolcott Rivers Gates on behalf of Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee.(Speckhart, Cullen)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee,3 Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY
Att: 1 Amended Procedures Order
Thursday, June 08, 2017
3 3 summon Summons and Notice; Health Diagnostic Laboratory, Inc. AP cases ONLY Thu 06/08 6:55 PM
Summons and notice issued to Duccio Baldari ; Cardiology Partners, P.L. ; Jean Foucauld ; Eliezer Hernandez ; Mauricio Melhado ; Neerav Shah ; Amarnath Vedere ; Chandra Venugopal Related [+] (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 06/08 12:31 AM
U.S. Treasury receipt of Complaint 17-04438 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number 26379974, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 06/07 11:41 PM
Adversary case 17-04438 Complaint against Cardiology Partners, P.L., Chandra Venugopal, Jean Foucauld, Amarnath Vedere, Neerav Shah, Eliezer Hernandez, Duccio Baldari, Mauricio Melhado filed by Richard Arrowsmith, Liquidating Trustee. Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:15-bk-32919 (McGraw, Diana)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2