North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Louise Wood Flanagan
Case #: 5:17-cv-00275
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jun 08, 2017
Terminated:Jun 29, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 05, 2017 4:31 AM EST
Defendant
Richard O Brajer
Represented By
Michael T. Wood
North Carolina Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Mandy K Cohen
Represented By
Michael T. Wood
North Carolina Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Nash County
Represented By
Maurice Greg Crumpler
Battle, Winslow, Scott & Wiley, PA
contact info
W. Dudley Whitley, III
Battle, Winslow, Scott & Wiley, PA
contact info
Defendant
North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By
Michael T. Wood
North Carolina Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Trillium Health Resources, NC
Represented By
Richard Paul Leissner, Jr.
Trillium Health Resources
contact info
Nicholas C. Brown
Howard, Stallings, From & Hutson P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Eastpointe Human Services
Represented By
Quintin D. Byrd
Forrest Firm, P.C.
contact info
R. Jonathan Charleston
The Charleston Group
contact info
Jose A. Coker
The Charleston Group
contact info
Wade E. Byrd
Law Offices Of Wade E Byrd PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, June 29, 2017
48 48 order Judgment Thu 06/29 1:32 PM
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the court GRANTS defendants' motions to dismiss. (DE 26, 30, and 31 ). Where the court lacks subject matter jurisdiction over the action, the court DENIES AS MOOT plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order (DE 6). This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/29/2017. (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
47 47 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Ex Parte Motion for TRO Thu 06/29 1:11 PM
ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 26 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 30 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Ex Parte denying as moot 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/29/2017. (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2017
46 46 order Order on Motion for TRO Mon 06/26 4:02 PM
ORDER dismissing as moot 42 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/26/2017. (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 06/26 8:21 AM
Remark -45 REPLY to Response to Motion submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2017
45 45 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 06/23 6:39 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion regarding6 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Eastpointe Human Services filed by Eastpointe Human Services. (Byrd, Quintin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Floyd v Floyd,
Att: 2 Exhibit Meineke Care Care Center v Catton,
Att: 3 Exhibit Atlantic Pinstriping, LLC v Atlantic Pinestriping Triad
44 44 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 06/23 11:30 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion regarding42 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Eastpointe Human Services. (Byrd, Quintin)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Fri 06/23 12:44 PM
Submitted the response43 and the reply at44 to District Judge Louise W. Flanagan. (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2017
43 43 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 06/22 5:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding42 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Richard O Brajer, Mandy K Cohen, North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services. (Wood, Michael)
Related: [-]
42 42 motion Temporary Restraining Order Thu 06/22 2:00 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Eastpointe Human Services. (Byrd, Quintin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Email Setting June 23, 2017 Deadline,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - DHHS's Proposed 2018 PIHP Contract with Eastpointe
order Text Order Thu 06/22 2:34 PM
TEXT ORDER - Defendants' response if any to the emergency motion just filed shall be made today. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/22/2017. (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Thu 06/22 3:07 PM
Motions Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: regarding6 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Eastpointe Human Services Related [+],42 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ,26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Addition to MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-] submitted
order Order Thu 06/22 3:39 PM
TEXT ORDER - The clerk's referral of motions just made on the docket is not meant to undo the briefing schedule in effect; but, rather the clerk simply meant to flag the case to the court's attention. As such, the schedule framed 6/13/17 remains controlling of timing of disposition of the matters at issue. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/22/2017. (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
41 41 respm Response Wed 06/21 4:36 PM
REPLY to Response regarding34 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Richard O Brajer, Mandy K Cohen, North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Trillium Health Resources. (Brown, Nicholas) Modified on 6/21/2017 to correct the document description (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
40 40 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 06/21 3:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion regarding6 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Eastpointe Human Services filed by Nash County. (Whitley, W.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2017
39 39 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/20 7:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding6 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Eastpointe Human Services filed by Richard O Brajer, Mandy K Cohen, North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services. (Wood, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Dave Richard
38 38 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/20 4:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition regarding6 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Eastpointe Human Services filed by Nash County. (Whitley, W.)
Related: [-]
37 37 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/20 4:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition regarding6 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Eastpointe Human Services filed by Nash County. (Whitley, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
36 36 respoth Memorandum in Opposition Tue 06/20 4:44 PM
Memorandum in Opposition regarding6 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Eastpointe Human Services filed by Nash County. (Whitley, W.)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice Notice-other Tue 06/20 11:48 AM
Notice filed by Eastpointe Human Services regarding34 Response in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit A to Docket Entry 34 - Eastpointe/DMA contract with Extension . (Byrd, Quintin)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 06/20 12:11 PM
TEXT ORDER regarding 35 - In light of the volume of materials filed in relation to the motion now pending, the court directs the parties to provide to the court one set of courtesy copies of papers filed in support of or in opposition to the motion within 14 days of the date of this order. Courtesy copies shall include all briefs and exhibits, except exhibits comprising unpublished cases. Courtesy copies shall be one-sided, tabbed, and secured with rubber bands or clips, but not placed in binders. Courtesy copies shall be delivered to the attention of the Clerk, U.S. District Court, 413 Middle St., New Bern, NC 28560. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/20/2017. (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2017
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/19 4:58 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Addition to MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eastpointe Human Services. (Byrd, Quintin)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 17, 2017
notice Notice to Counsel Sat 06/17 1:37 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL. The parties are reminded to include the judge assignment on all future pleadings. The case number should read as 5:17-CV-275-FL. No need to refile anything at this time. (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Correction Sat 06/17 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF CORRECTION regarding:33 Memorandum in Support. Counsel did not properly identify attachments pursuant to Section V.E. of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. Attachments must be clearly labeled (i.e., Exhibit 1" is not a sufficient description). Case administrator included a document description to this exhibit at33 . No need to refile anything at this time. (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2017
33 33 respoth Memorandum in Support Thu 06/15 4:04 PM
Memorandum in Support filed by Nash County. (Crumpler, Maurice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
32 32 respoth Memorandum in Support Thu 06/15 4:00 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Richard O Brajer, Mandy K Cohen, North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services. (Wood, Michael)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 06/15 3:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Richard O Brajer, Mandy K Cohen, North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services. (Wood, Michael)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 06/15 3:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nash County. (Crumpler, Maurice)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/15 3:16 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Maurice Greg Crumpler on behalf of Nash County. (Crumpler, Maurice)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/15 2:50 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Michael T. Wood on behalf of Richard O Brajer, Mandy K Cohen, North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services. (Wood, Michael)
Related: [-]
27 27 respoth Memorandum in Support Thu 06/15 2:01 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Addition to MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Trillium Health Resources. (Brown, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Thu 06/15 2:00 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in Addition to , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Trillium Health Resources. (Brown, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/14 1:59 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Richard Paul Leissner, Jr on behalf of Trillium Health Resources. (Leissner, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
24 24 service Affidavit of Service Tue 06/13 6:03 PM
Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint, Motion and Memorandum for TRO; Docket Entries 1 through 7 filed by Eastpointe Human Services served on North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services on June 12, 2017. (Coker, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 A - FedEx Airbill for Affidavit of Service - NCDHHS
23 23 service Affidavit of Service Tue 06/13 5:56 PM
Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint, Motion and Memorandum for TRO; Docket Entries 1 through 7 filed by Eastpointe Human Services served on Nash County - Care of Zee Lamb on June 12, 2017. (Coker, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - FedEx Airbill for Affidavit of Service - Nash County
22 22 service Affidavit of Service Tue 06/13 5:47 PM
Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint, Motion and Memorandum for TRO; Docket Entries 1 through 7 filed by Eastpointe Human Services served on Mandy K. Cohen, official capacity on June 12, 2017. (Coker, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - FedEx Airbill for Affidavit of Service - Cohen
21 21 service Affidavit of Service Tue 06/13 1:25 PM
Affidavit of Service for Summons, Complaint, Motion and Memorandum for TRO; Docket Entries 1 through 7 filed by Eastpointe Human Services served on Richard Brajer, former official capacity on June 12, 2017. (Coker, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - FedEx Airbill for Affidavit of Service - Brajer, former official capacity
20 20 respoth Memorandum in Opposition Tue 06/13 12:29 PM
Memorandum in Opposition regarding6 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Eastpointe Human Services Amended filed by Trillium Health Resources. (Brown, Nicholas) Modified on 6/13/2017 to clarify docket entry text (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Elezabeth Wainwright,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Eastpointe Investigative Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Resolution by Nash County Board of County Commissioners,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 Resolution of Governing Board of Trillium,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 Email from Division of Medical Assistance,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 Trillium transition plan,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 Letter from Nash County requesting Eastpointes cooperation,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 Letter from Trillium to Eastpointe CEO
19 19 service Certificate of Service Tue 06/13 11:42 AM
Certificate of Service filed by Trillium Health Resources regarding15 Financial Disclosure Statement . (Brown, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/13 11:35 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Wade E. Byrd on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Byrd, Wade)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/13 10:36 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Nicholas C. Brown on behalf of Trillium Health Resources. (Brown, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/13 9:58 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by W. Dudley Whitley, III on behalf of Nash County. (Whitley, W.)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 06/13 9:43 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Trillium Health Resources (Brown, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/13 9:22 AM
*CORRECTED AND REFILED AT16 * Notice of Appearance filed by W. Dudley Whitley, III on behalf of Nash County. (Whitley, W.) Modified on 6/13/2017 (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/13 9:21 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Nicholas C. Brown on behalf of Trillium Health Resources. (Brown, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/13 9:20 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Nicholas C. Brown on behalf of Trillium Health Resources. (Brown, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency - Filing is not text searchable Tue 06/13 8:11 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding11 Notice of Appearance - Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. Each attorney must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of multiple attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. Additionally, it appears that counsel included the signature page from docket entry 10 in the filed document. Counsel must refile to bring this document into compliance with the court's rules. (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 06/13 9:37 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding13 Notice of Appearance - Each attorney must file his or her own Notice of Appearance. The CM/ECF electronic filing and docketing system does not recognize filings made on behalf of multiple attorneys for purposes of appearing on the court's docket. The notice of appearance for Richard P. Leissner, Jr. must be refiled using his CM/ECF login information. (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency - Filing is not text searchable Tue 06/13 9:38 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding14 Notice of Appearance - Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 06/13 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding15 Financial Disclosure Statement - Counsel failed to attach a certificate of service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d) and Section VI(B) of the Court's CM/ECF Electronic Policies and Procedures Manual. Counsel should file a separately captioned certificate of service using the appropriate event located under the Civil Events - Service of Process category. (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 06/13 1:16 PM
Remark -20 Memorandum in Opposition submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 06/13 2:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan in New Bern, NC Chambers: Administrative Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 6/13/2017 - R. Jonathan Charleston, Quinton D. Byrd, Jose A. Coker, and Wade E. Byrd in attendance on behalf of plaintiff - Michael T. Wood, Nicholas C. Brown, Richard P. Leissner, Jr., M. Greg Crumpler, and W. Dudley Whitley, III present for defendants - Defendant Richard O. Brajer is not represented, although Michael T. Wood anticipates entering an appearance on Mr. Brajer's behalf - Defendants to file motion to dismiss regarding the subject matter jurisdiction issue by 6/15/2017 - If consolidated, the court allows a 45-page limitation for the memoranda in support - Plaintiff's response due by the end of business day on 6/19/2017 - Defendants' reply due by 6/21/2017 - Plaintiff's6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is no longer ex parte - North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services and Nash County to respond to plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order/injunctive relief by 6/20/2017 - Plaintiff's reply due by 6/23/2017 - All parties agree that there will be no prejudice should the court take up these matters without a hearing (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2017
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 06/12 4:55 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by W. Dudley Whitley, III on behalf of Nash County. (Whitley, W.)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/12 3:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding6 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Eastpointe Human Services filed by Trillium Health Resources. (Brown, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit
utility Remark Mon 06/12 9:14 AM
Remark -9 RESPONSE to Motion submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 06/12 3:16 PM
**** Set Hearing:Telephonic Administrative Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2017 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan. Counsel will be provided dial-in instructions via e-mail in advance of the conference. (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 06/12 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding10 Response in Opposition to Motion - Counsel failed to identify each exhibit or attachment pursuant to Section L(2)(b) of the Court's Electronic Policies and Procedures Manual. Counsel is instructed to refile the document making sure that each attached exhibit is properly identified using a complete description in the docket entry text. (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 06/12 3:53 PM
Notice to Counsel (Richard P. Leissner, Jr. and Nicholas C. Brown) - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Tripp, S.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2017
9 9 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/09 5:28 PM
RESPONSE to Motion regarding6 EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Eastpointe Human Services filed by North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services. (Wood, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/09 5:26 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Michael T. Wood on behalf of North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services. (Wood, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 06/08 1:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Richard O Brajer, Mandy K Cohen, Nash County, North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Trillium Health Resources. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Edwards, S.)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Ex Parte Motion for TRO Thu 06/08 10:48 AM
EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Eastpointe Human Services . (Coker, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of TRO
5 5 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Thu 06/08 10:30 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Eastpointe Human Services (Coker, Jose)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/08 10:25 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by R. Jonathan Charleston on behalf of Eastpointe Human Services. (Charleston, R.)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/08 10:23 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Quintin D. Byrd on behalf of Eastpointe Human Services. (Byrd, Quintin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/08 10:19 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jose A. Coker on behalf of Eastpointe Human Services. (Coker, Jose)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/08 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT Verified against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4118370.), filed by Eastpointe Human Services. (Coker, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons,
Att: 7 Proposed Summons,
Att: 8 Index,
Att: 9 Exhibit A - Plan of Merger,
Att: 10 Exhibit B - Brajer 10/30/15 Memo,
Att: 11 Exhibit C - Brajer's 5/17/17 Memo,
Att: 12 Exhibit D Trillium's 5/16/16 Correspondence,
Att: 13 Exhibit E - Trillium's 11/28/16 Correspondence,
Att: 14 Exhibit F - Counsel's Letter to Brajer 12/1/16,
Att: 15 Exhibit G - Brajer's Approval 12/5/16,
Att: 16 Exhibit H - Nash County Correspondence 11/10/15,
Att: 17 Exhibit I - Eastponite's Letter to Nash 11/16/15,
Att: 18 Exhibit J - Proposed NCDHHS Rules 6/15/16,
Att: 19 Exhibit K - Adopted Rules 2/1/17,
Att: 20 Exhibit L - Nash County Resolution 11/22/16,
Att: 21 Exhibit M -Brajer's Demand to Eastpointe 6/13/16,
Att: 22 Exhibit N - Cohen's Request for Transition 3/1/17,
Att: 23 Exhibit O - Eastpointe's Letter to Cohen 3/6/17,
Att: 24 Exhibit P - Cardinal's Letter to Trillium 3/10/17,
Att: 25 Exhibit Q - Cohen's Letter to Eastpointe 3/16/17,
Att: 26 Exhibit R - Eastpointe's Correspondence on destabilization 4/7/17,
Att: 27 Exhibit S - Cohen's Letter to Eastpointe and Cardinal 5/1/17,
Att: 28 Exhibit T - Eastponite's Request for Meeting 5/2/17,
Att: 29 Exhibit U - Affidavit of Catherine V. Dalton,
Att: 30 Exhibit V - Communication Bulletin
notice Notice to Counsel Thu 06/08 11:32 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding:6 Ex Parte Motion for TRO. In the future, Counsel should file their Motion first and then file the Memorandum in Support, using the MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT event located under the Responses and Replies category, linking the motion when prompted to do so. See Section V.E.1(b) of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]