Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Roberta A Colton
Case #: 8:89-bk-09718
Case Filed:Dec 27, 1989
Creditor Meeting:Feb 01, 1990
Terminated:Sep 06, 2023
Plan Confirmed:Mar 02, 1995

Debtor
Jw Aluminum Company
Old Mt. Holly Rd.
Mt. Holly, SC 29463
Represented By
Mark M Maloney
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Don M Stichter
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A.
contact info
Kevin J O'Brien
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Scott A. Stichter
Stichter, Riedel, Blain & Postler, P.A.
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/06 11:30 AM
Adversary Case 8:17-ap-480 Closed. (Anel)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 09/06 11:36 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Anel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 11, 2023
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Thu 01/12 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Related [+]. Notice Date 01/11/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #37 )
Friday, January 06, 2023
37 37 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 01/06 7:35 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Ashley C. Parrish for Jw Aluminum Company. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded Related [+]. Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Tonya)
Related: [-] 36
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
36 36 motion Motion to Appear pro hac vice (BK) Wed 01/04 2:34 PM
Motion of Ashley C. Parrish to Appear pro hac vice and Written Designation and Consent to Act as Local Counsel Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Jw Aluminum Company (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Reassignment of Lead Atty or Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Wed 05/11 2:10 PM
Reassignment of Lead Attorney. Teresa Marie Dorr of the United States Trustee's Office is Substituted for Scott E Bomkamp of the United States Trustee's Office . (Sara M.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 02, 2021
court COURT - (NO PAPER) Reassignment of Lead Atty or Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) Thu 09/02 2:58 PM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
35 35 notice Notice Of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 11/28 2:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Office of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA 11. (Peair, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2017
Notice of Reassignment of Case to The Honorable Roberta A. Colton. (Mike)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2017
34 34 notice Notice Of Compliance Tue 06/20 10:35 AM
Notice of Compliance Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Jw Aluminum Company Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 31
33 33 notice Notice Of Compliance Tue 06/20 10:33 AM
Notice of Compliance Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Jw Aluminum Company Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 30
Monday, June 19, 2017
32 32 misc Proof of Service Mon 06/19 10:17 AM
Proof of Service of Order on Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Jw Aluminum Company Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 29
court ADI Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day Mon 06/19 12:18 AM
A properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order29 is not indicated on the docket. Scott Stichter is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2017
misc Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY) Thu 06/15 2:51 PM
Service completed via CM/ECF electronic notification. Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Jw Aluminum Company Related [+]. (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-] 31 ,30
court Spread Text Fri 06/16 11:30 AM
Complaint by JW Aluminum Company against Michael H. Holland, Michael McKown, Joseph R. Reschini, and Carlo Tarley, as Trustees of the United Mine Workers of America 1992 Benefit Plan, Michael H. Holland, Michael McKown, William P. Hobgood, Marty Hudson, Joseph R. Reschini, Carl E. Vanhorn, and Gail R. Wilensky, as Trustees of the United Mine Workers of American Combined Benefit Fun. Filing Fee Not Required.[LINK:8:17-ap-00480-KRM] . Nature of Suit: [91 (Declaratory judgment)],[72 (Injunctive relief - other)]. (Scott S.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
31 31 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 06/13 4:09 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Mark M Maloney for Jw Aluminum Company. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded Related [+]. Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Christiane)
Related: [-] 28
30 30 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 06/13 4:06 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Kevin J O'Brien for Jw Aluminum Company. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded Related [+]. Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Christiane)
Related: [-] 26
29 29 order Order Ruling on Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case Tue 06/13 3:35 PM
Order Granting Motion To Reopen Chapter 11 Case Related [+]. Service Instructions: Scott Stichter is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Christiane)
Related: [-] 25
court Corrective Entry - Corrective Action Required (SB) Tue 06/13 2:21 PM
ERROR NOTIFICATION to Scott Stichter. The event you selected does not match the Pdf image you filed. NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS FILING, Related [+]. (Christiane)
Related: [-] 27
Friday, June 09, 2017
28 28 motion Motion to Appear pro hac vice Fri 06/09 12:51 PM
Motion of Mark M. Maloney to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Jw Aluminum Company (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Motion to Appear pro hac vice Fri 06/09 12:43 PM
DOCUMENT NOT PROCESSED (Docket event/PDF combination do not match). NO ACTION WILL BE TAKEN BY THE COURT ON THIS DOCUMENT. Motion of Mark M. Maloney to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Jw Aluminum Company (Stichter, Scott) Modified on 06/13/2017 (Christiane)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Motion to Appear pro hac vice Fri 06/09 12:41 PM
Motion of Kevin J. O'Brien to Appear pro hac vice Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Jw Aluminum Company (Stichter, Scott)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case Fri 06/09 12:40 PM
Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case. (Fee Paid) Filed by Scott A. Stichter on behalf of Debtor Jw Aluminum Company (Stichter, Scott) Modified on 6/12/2017 (Christiane).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Complaint
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Complaint
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Complaint
crditcrd Receipt of Filing Fee Fri 06/09 12:44 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion to Reopen Chapter 11 Case(8:89-bk-09718-ALP) [motion,mreop11] (1167.00). Receipt Number 53900617, Amount Paid $1167.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]