Cardona et al v. Kelly et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond J Dearie |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03508 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 07/31 4:43 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: the action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Janet Hamilton Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer Clerk of Court on 7/31/2017. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 07/31 4:25 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice. SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 7/31/2017. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/31 1:45 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal for the Court's endorsement by John F. Kelly, James McCament, John Thompson (Marutollo, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Wed 07/26 9:47 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DIRECTING A RESPONSE re6 MOTION for pre motion conference on the grounds that this action is now moot filed by John F. Kelly, James McCament, John Thompson. Counsel for plaintiff will respond to above request for a pre motion conference on or before July 31, 2017. So Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 7/26/2017. (Mulqueen, Ellen) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Mon 07/24 5:16 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference on the grounds that this action is now moot by John F. Kelly, James McCament, John Thompson. (Marutollo, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/22 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Anthony Marutollo on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Marutollo, Joseph) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/12 11:34 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/12 11:34 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 06/12 11:33 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/12 1:38 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9593990 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Liliana Maria Cardona, Carlos Humberto Cardona. (Barua, Rajesh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/12 11:27 AM
Case assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |