Goldfarb v. The New York and Presbyterian Hospital et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | I Leo Glasser |
Referred: | Peggy Kuo |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03513 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2017 4:38 AM EST |
Defendant
City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The New York and Presbyterian Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hadas Goldfarb
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 01 2017
ORDER granting 13 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying 13 Motion for Attorney Fees. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9/1/2017. (Weitzer, Iliza) |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
order
Order of Remand to State Court
Tue 09/05 1:25 PM
Order of Remand to State Court, Pursuant to22 , this case is remanded to the NY Supreme Court, Kings County, under Index No. 510225/2017. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9/1/2017. A certified copy of this Order mailed to NY Supreme Court, Kings County. (Layne, Monique) |
||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Fri 09/01 3:01 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying13 Motion for Attorney Fees. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9/1/2017. (Weitzer, Iliza) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Wed 08/16 5:52 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Reply filed by Hadas Goldfarb. (Aron, Joseph) |
|
20 | 20
respoth
Reply in Support
Wed 08/16 5:49 PM
REPLY in Support of Motion to Remand & for Attorney's Fees filed by Hadas Goldfarb. (Aron, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Fri 08/04 3:35 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re13 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court Notice of MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by The New York and Presbyterian Hospital. (Medley, Lori) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/04 3:28 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re11 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court ,13 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court Notice of MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by The New York and Presbyterian Hospital. (Medley, Lori) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Lori A. Medley, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Lori A. Medley | ||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 07/28 10:47 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 7/28/2017. (Kessler, Stanley) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 07/27 4:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court Notice of MOTION for Attorney Fees by The New York and Presbyterian Hospital. (Medley, Lori) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 07/05 10:30 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the motion to remand to state court. Responses due by 7/28/2017. Replies due by 8/29/2017. The time to answer the complaint is extended to 14 days after a decision on the motion to remand. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 7/5/2017. (Kessler, Stanley) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 06/30 1:42 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court ,13 Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court Notice of MOTION for Attorney Fees ,9 Amended Complaint by The New York and Presbyterian Hospital. (Medley, Lori) |
|
Sunday, June 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Remand to State Court Attorney Fees
Sun 06/25 10:20 AM
Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court , Notice of MOTION for Attorney Fees by Hadas Goldfarb. (Aron, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C | ||
12 | 12
motion
Remand to State Court
Sun 06/25 10:13 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court Memorandom of Law in Support by Hadas Goldfarb. (Aron, Joseph) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Remand to State Court
Sun 06/25 10:10 AM
Notice of MOTION to Remand to State Court by Hadas Goldfarb. (Aron, Joseph) |
|
utility
Terminate Motions (filed in error)
Mon 06/26 10:41 AM
Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly:12 MOTION to Remand to State Court . This is the Memo. of Law In Support of document 13 , the actual motion. ***Filer please DO NOT re-enter the filing.*** (Layne, Monique) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 06/23 4:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint by City of New York. (Fain, Courtney) Modified on 6/23/2017 (Feldman, Shira) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 06/23 5:13 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for Defendant City of New York to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to July 13, 2017 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/23/2017. (Feldman, Shira) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 06/13 6:15 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hadas Goldfarb. (Aron, Joseph) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/13 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Patrice Fain on behalf of City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Fain, Courtney) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 06/13 2:36 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE MOVE by The New York and Presbyterian Hospital (Medley, Lori) Modified on 6/13/2017 to reflect that this should be a Motion (Feldman, Shira) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 06/13 5:50 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant The New York and Presbyterian Hospital to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to July 13, 2017 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/13/2017. (Feldman, Shira) |
||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Certificate of Counsel
Mon 06/12 2:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re1 Notice of Removal, by Lori A Medley on behalf of The New York and Presbyterian Hospital (Medley, Lori) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/12 1:13 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/12 1:12 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/12 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lori A Medley on behalf of The New York and Presbyterian Hospital (aty to be noticed) (Medley, Lori) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/12 11:51 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The New York and Presbyterian Hospital (Frank, James) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 06/12 11:48 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The New York and Presbyterian Hospital from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, case number 510225/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9595272) (Frank, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/12 1:12 PM
Case assigned to Judge I. Leo Glasser and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |