131
|
|
131
misc
Transcript
Fri 08/11 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/20/2020, before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber ARIA SERVICES, INC.. Email address: Aria@leinen.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/1/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2023. (AJ)
Related: [-]
|
130
|
|
130
misc
Transcript
Fri 08/11 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/23/2020, before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber ARIA SERVICES, INC.. Email address: Aria@leinen.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/1/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2023. (AJ)
Related: [-]
|
129
|
|
129
misc
Transcript
Fri 08/11 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/7/2020, before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber ARIA SERVICES, INC.. Email address: Aria@leinen.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/1/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2023. (AJ)
Related: [-]
|
128
|
|
128
misc
Transcript
Fri 08/11 11:15 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 24, 2020, before Judge Reyes. Court Reporter/Transcriber Transcriptions Plus II, Inc. Email address: RL.Transcriptions2@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 9/1/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2023. (LH)
Related: [-]
|