Greenbaum et al v. Behnke et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Denis R Hurley |
Referred: | Anne Y Shields |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03512 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 09, 2017 5:01 AM EST |
Defendant
Matthew Behnke
as Director for Sandy Claims for the Federal Emergency Management Act 500 C Street SW
Washington, DC 20472 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Federal Emergency Management Agency
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert J. Fenton, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David I. Maurstad
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Roy E. Wright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Greenbaum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Simone Greenbaum
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/15 12:51 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The stipulation of dismissal, DE18 , without prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 8/15/2017. (Bochner, Francesca) |
||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/14 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Jeanette Freismuth on behalf of Matthew Behnke, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Robert J. Fenton, Jr, David I. Maurstad, Roy E. Wright (aty to be noticed) (Freismuth, Megan) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 08/14 1:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Matthew Behnke, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Robert J. Fenton, Jr, David I. Maurstad, Roy E. Wright (Freismuth, Megan) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 07/27 5:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Simone Greenbaum, David Greenbaum. (Halpern, Philip) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 07/27 5:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Simone Greenbaum, David Greenbaum. (Halpern, Philip) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 07/27 5:53 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Simone Greenbaum, David Greenbaum. Federal Emergency Management Agency served on 6/15/2017, answer due 8/14/2017. (Halpern, Philip) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 07/27 5:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Simone Greenbaum, David Greenbaum. Roy E. Wright served on 6/15/2017, answer due 8/14/2017. (Halpern, Philip) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 07/27 5:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Simone Greenbaum, David Greenbaum. David I. Maurstad served on 6/15/2017, answer due 8/14/2017. (Halpern, Philip) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 07/27 5:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Simone Greenbaum, David Greenbaum. Robert J. Fenton, Jr served on 6/15/2017, answer due 8/14/2017. (Halpern, Philip) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 07/27 5:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Simone Greenbaum, David Greenbaum. Matthew Behnke served on 6/15/2017, answer due 8/14/2017. (Halpern, Philip) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/21 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Michael Salant on behalf of David Greenbaum, Simone Greenbaum (aty to be noticed) (Salant, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/14 10:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Roy E. Wright, on 06/14/2017. (Fagan, Linda) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/14 10:54 AM
Summons Issued as to David I. Maurstad, on 06/14/2017. (Fagan, Linda) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/14 10:49 AM
Summons Issued as to Robert J. Fenton, Jr., on 06/14/2017. (Fagan, Linda) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/14 10:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Matthew Behnke, on 06/14/2017. (Fagan, Linda) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 06/13 4:41 PM
Proposed Summons. by David Greenbaum, Simone Greenbaum (Halpern, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 06/13 9:59 AM
Summons Issued as to Federal Emergency Management Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
Att: 1 Summons United States Attorney, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Attorney General of the United States | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 06/13 9:52 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 06/13 9:50 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Tue 06/13 9:50 AM
Proposed summonses, in attachments 2, 3, 4, and 5 to complaint, are rejected; the defendants listed in the section that reads "To: (Defendant's name and address)" do not match the defendants in the caption of the complaint; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summonses. Counsel is advised to submit completed proposed summonses using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/13 9:52 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/12 12:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Matthew Behnke, Federal Emergency Management Agency, Robert J. Fenton, Jr, David I. Maurstad, Roy E. Wright filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9595276 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Simone Greenbaum, David Greenbaum. (Halpern, Philip) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit C |