Arizona District Court
Judge:James A Teilborg
Case #: 3:17-cv-08108
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Jun 09, 2017
Terminated:Mar 27, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 06, 2017 2:49 AM MST
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated
Represented By
Steven Gregory Biddle
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Stanley Ray Foreman, Jr
Littler Mendelson Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Plaintiff
Carol M Whitmire
Represented By
Joshua William Carden
Joshua Carden Law Firm Pc - Scottsdale, Az
contact info

GPO Nov 21 2018
ORDER that the parties shall file simultaneous briefs by Friday, December 7, 2018 on: (1) why the Court should or should not hold that sections 23-493(6) and 23-493.06(A)(6) of the DTEA unconstitutionally amended the AMMA; and (2) if the Court does find these sections of the DTEA unconstitutional under the Voter Protection Act, why Plaintiff should or should not be entitled to summary judgment on her claim under the AMMA pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(f). No responses or replies to the supplemental briefs will be permitted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each brief shall not exceed 10 pages in length. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/21/18. (CLB)
GPO Nov 27 2018
ORDER/CERTIFICATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION TO THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE STATE OF ARIZONA- The Clerk shall serve a copy of this Certification on the Office of the Attorney General for the State of Arizona via certified mail, along with a copy of the Court's November 21, 2018 44 Order and Plaintiff's 45 Notice of Constitutional Question. If the Attorney General chooses to intervene, he must do so no later than sixty days from the date Plaintiff filed her 45 Notice of Constitutional Question pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.1(c). See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/27/18. (MSA)
GPO Jan 23 2019
ORDER granting 54 the State of Arizona's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in support of no party. (See attached Order for additional information.) Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 1/23/2019. (RMW)
GPO Feb 07 2019
ORDER - Plaintiff's 35 Rule 56(d) Application (Doc. 35 at 1113) is DENIED. Defendant's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's First Count alleging wrongful termination under the AMMA and AEPA is DISMISSED as duplicative of Plaintiffs Second Count. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/7/19. (MSA)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, March 27, 2019
60 60 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/27 11:46 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE: Pursuant to the Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice (Doc.59 ), this case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear her or its own attorneys' fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 5/20/2019 trial and the 5/8/2019 final pretrial conference are both vacated. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 3/27/2019. (RMW)
Related: [-]
59 59 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/27 8:55 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated.(Foreman, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 26, 2019
58 58 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/26 3:43 PM
ORDER re:57 Notice of Settlement: Because no stipulation to dismiss this case has been filed, IT IS ORDERED confirming all deadlines, hearings, and the trial date. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 3/26/2019. (RMW)
Related: [-]
57 57 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 03/26 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Wal-Mart Stores Incorporated. (Biddle, Steven)
Related: [-]