WILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Kelly |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01149 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 4:09 AM EST |
Defendant
UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
WILDEARTH GUARDIANS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 11/20 5:24 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (King, Laura) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 10/19 8:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties'22 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its application for attorney's fees and costs by November 20, 2018, unless a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) is filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/19/2018. (lctjk2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 10/19 9:44 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's application for attorney's fees and costs due by 11/20/2018. (jl) |
||
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Thu 10/18 5:07 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (King, Laura) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 09/25 3:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties'21 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its application for attorney's fees and costs by October 25, 2018, unless a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) is filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/25/2018. (lctjk2) |
||
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Mon 09/24 6:53 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (King, Laura) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 07/30 8:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties'20 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall files its application for attorney's fees and costs by September 25, 2018, unless a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) is filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/30/2018. (lctjk2) |
||
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Status Report
Fri 07/27 2:36 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Cohen, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Tue 05/29 6:35 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. Attorney Shannon I. Laun terminated. (Laun, Shannon) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 05/22 9:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties'18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the case is stayed until August 3, 2018. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by July 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/22/2018. (lctjk2) |
||
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Mon 05/21 1:47 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Cohen, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Tue 04/24 7:32 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by John R. Mellgren (Mellgren, John) |
|
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/23 5:58 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (King, Laura) |
|
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 04/23 6:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties'16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the case is stayed until May 31, 2018. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by May 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/23/2018. (lctjk2) |
||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 02/09 11:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties'15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the case is stayed until April 30, 2018. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by April 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/9/2018. (lctjk2) |
||
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Wed 02/07 2:14 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (King, Laura) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/20 12:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties'14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED, nunc pro tunc to 11/16/2017, that the case is stayed until February 14, 2018. It is further ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, by February 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/20/2017. (lctjk2) |
||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Tue 11/14 5:54 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Cohen, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/26 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon I. Laun on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Laun, Shannon) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/26 10:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Granting12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Shannon I. Laun is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/26/17. (DJS) |
||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/18 7:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Shannon Laun, :Firm- Western Environmental Law Center, :Address- 1402 Third Avenue, Suite 1022, Seattle, WA 98101. Phone No. - (206) 487-7225. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5121316. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS(Mellgren, John) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 09/18 10:50 AM
Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Tanya S. Chutkan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 08/21 7:48 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a joint report, along with a proposed order, to apprise the Court of the status of this proceeding by 11/16/2017. (jth) |
||
Saturday, August 19, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Sat 08/19 2:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Granting11 Joint Motion to Stay. This action is hereby STAYED until November 16, 2017, by which date the parties shall file a joint status report (along with a proposed order) to apprise the Court of the status of this proceeding. Either party may move to lift this stay during the pendency of the stay or any court-approved extensions thereof. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/19/17. (DJS) |
||
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stay
Fri 08/18 10:14 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Cohen, Jason) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 07/20 1:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendant to file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to August 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/20/17. (DJS) |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/19 7:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT(Cohen, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/19 7:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Cohen, Jason) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/06 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura H. King on behalf of WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (King, Laura) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 07/06 12:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Granting2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Laura H. King is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Pro hac applicants who seek admission more than twice within two years are highly encouraged to become members of the Bar for this court. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/6/17. (DJS) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Wed 06/21 3:18 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 6/19/2017(Mellgren, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Mailing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Wed 06/21 3:13 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/19/2017.(Mellgren, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Mailing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney
Wed 06/21 3:08 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/19/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/19/2017.(Mellgren, John) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Mailing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit - Certified Mail Receipts | ||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Tue 06/13 2:34 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(sb) |
|
3 | 3
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Tue 06/13 12:38 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Mellgren, John) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/13 12:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laura H. King, :Firm- Western Environmental Law Center, :Address- 103 Reeder's Alley, Helena, Montana 59601. Phone No. - 406-204-4852. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4988615. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS(Mellgren, John) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/13 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4988556) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS.(Mellgren, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons U.S. Bureau of Land Management, | ||
Att: 3 Summons U.S. Attorney District of DC, | ||
Att: 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/13 2:30 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (sb) |