Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Mark H Cohen
Case #: 1:17-cv-02163
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) Labor - Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2017
Terminated:Dec 04, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 3:47 AM EST
Defendant
The Village Vets Buckhead, Inc.
Represented By
John Colquitt Rogers
Carlock Copeland & Stair, Llp - Atl
contact info
Tawny D. Mack
Carlock Copeland & Stair, Llp - Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Monseur
Represented By
Victor Severin Roberts
Barrett & Farahany, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, December 04, 2017
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Tue 12/05 8:37 AM
ORDER- The Court GRANTS the parties'12 Joint Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement and APPROVES the parties' Settlement Agreement and DISMISSES all claims in the above-styled action WITH PREJUDICE. The Court ORDERS that the payment of the settlement amounts and attorney's fees shall be made as provided in the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/4/2017. (rjs)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Settlement Mon 12/04 1:00 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval with Brief In Support by Kimberly Monseur.(Roberts, Victor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order B - Proposed Order
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 12/05 8:37 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (rjs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
11 11 discov Certificate of Service Tue 09/05 5:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendants The Village Vets Buckhead, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production by The Village Vets Buckhead, Inc..(Mack, Tawny)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2017
10 10 order Scheduling Order Thu 08/03 4:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 8/3/2017. (sap)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 08/03 12:05 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Kimberly Monseur. (Roberts, Victor)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2017
8 8 discov Certificate of Service Mon 07/31 11:22 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Plaintiff Kimberly Monseur's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Kimberly Monseur.(Roberts, Victor)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2017
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 07/13 1:06 PM
Clerks Notation re [6 & 7] Certificates of Interested Persons reviewed by MHC. (jgs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 07/11 2:12 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Kimberly Monseur. (Roberts, Victor)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 07/10 12:03 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by The Village Vets Buckhead, Inc.. (Mack, Tawny)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/10 12:00 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by The Village Vets Buckhead, Inc.. Discovery ends on 12/7/2017.(Mack, Tawny)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Wed 06/21 8:43 AM
Return of Service Executed by Kimberly Monseur. The Village Vets Buckhead, Inc. served on 6/19/2017, answer due 7/10/2017. (Roberts, Victor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
3 3 order Order Tue 06/13 2:49 PM
STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 6/13/17. (jpa)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 06/13 2:16 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to The Village Vets Buckhead, Inc. (jkl)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 06/13 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kimberly Monseur. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7204437.)(jkl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet