10
|
|
10
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 09/28 3:08 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that plaintiff Lisa Caceres' motion for default judgment is granted; that defendant Stellar Collection Services Inc., is liable to plaintiff Lisa Caceres for $500.00 in statutory damages and $5,235.00 in attorneys' fees and costs, for a total of $5,735.00; and that this case is closed. Ordered by the Clerk of Court on 9/28/2018. (Tirado, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 09/27 4:04 PM
ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment against defendant as follows: Defendant is liable to plaintiff Lisa Caceres for $500.00 in statutory damages and $5,235.00 in attorneys' fees and costs, for a total of $5,735.00. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/27/2018. (Ortiz, Grisel)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
motion
Default Judgment
Mon 11/13 4:20 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Lisa Caceres. Responses due by 11/30/2017 (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Memorandum in Support,
|
| |
Att: 2
Declaration,
|
| |
Att: 3
Proposed Judgment
|
7
|
|
7
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 08/28 9:36 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Stellar Collection Services Inc. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Stellar Collection Services Inc. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Thu 08/24 5:45 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Lisa Caceres (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/02 7:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Lisa Caceres (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/28 3:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Caceres. Stellar Collection Services Inc. served on 6/27/2017, answer due 7/18/2017. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/14 9:03 AM
Summons Issued as to Stellar Collection Services Inc. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/14 9:01 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 06/14 8:59 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/14 9:00 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/13 9:48 AM
COMPLAINT against Stellar Collection Services Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9598282 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Lisa Caceres. (Sanders, Craig)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1,
|
| |
Att: 2
Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 3
Proposed Summons
|