Rosa Darakchyan v. Life Insurance Company of North America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-04383 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 10, 2017 1:14 AM PST |
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosa Darakchyan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismissing Case
Fri 08/11 5:03 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case14 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 08/09 11:27 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Vana, Allison) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 08/03 12:30 PM
Effective August 7, 2017, Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 690 on the 6th Floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 690 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mailbox located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th Floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 07/26 3:03 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT by Judge George H. Wu: On July 25, 2017, Plaintiff Rosa Darakchyan filed a Notice of Settlement. The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re: Settlement Hearing for September 28, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are advised that the order to show cause will be vacated and no appearance will be required provided that a Stipulation to Dismiss, with a proposed order, is filed by noon on September 27, 2017. (cr) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Settlement
Tue 07/25 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Rosa Darakchyan. (Kantor, Glenn) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Wed 07/12 9:22 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 8/18/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Linda Marie Lawson added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Lawson, Linda) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 07/06 9:37 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rosa Darakchyan, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 6/29/2017, answer due 7/20/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System as Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 06/27 1:15 PM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. (kss) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 06/14 2:04 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 06/14 1:59 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 06/14 1:59 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 06/13 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rosa Darakchyan, (Kantor, Glenn) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Tue 06/13 2:15 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Rosa Darakchyan. (Kantor, Glenn) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 06/13 2:14 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rosa Darakchyan. (Kantor, Glenn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 06/13 2:09 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20012248 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rosa Darakchyan. (Attorney Glenn R Kantor added to party Rosa Darakchyan(pty:pla))(Kantor, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 |