Cordova, Jr. et al v. East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:16-bk-32200
Lead BK case is: 4:16-bk-32200
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 13 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:17-ap-03288 |
Nature of Suit | 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA
135 N. Robles Avenue, 7th Floor
Pasadena, CA 91101 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nathan Smith
Malcolm & Cisneros, a Law Corporation 2112 Business Center Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Malcolm & Cisneros, a Law Corporation
2112 Business Center Drive
Irvine, CA 92612 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guadalupe Cordova, Jr.
9254 Dexter
Houston, TX 77075 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Herlinda Cordova
9254 Dexter
Houston, TX 77075 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |
Friday, November 02, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 11/02 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 11/02/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/31 3:34 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing Complaint and Closing Adversary Proceeding 4:17-ap-3288, Signed on 10/31/201 . (rcas) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/31 10:43 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Guadalupe Cordova Jr., Herlinda Cordova (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, October 06, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 10/06 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 10/06/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Generic Order (Adversary)
Thu 10/04 1:10 PM
COPY OF Order Approving Application to Compromise Controversy, Signed on 10/4/2018(rltd doc#74Motion filed in main bk case 16-32200 13) (rcas) |
|
Saturday, December 30, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 12/30 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 12/30/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Comprehensive Scheduling Order
Thu 12/28 1:37 PM
Comprehensive Scheduling Order Signed on 12/28/2017 Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/1/2018 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). Pre-Trial Order due by 10/14/2018. Discovery due by 6/28/2018. Trial date set for 11/8/2018 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (mrios) |
|
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Fri 12/29 2:08 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Hearing Held: 10:30 AM. Appearances: Mayur Patel for the Plaintiff. Nathan Smith for Eastwest Bank. Mr. Patel announced he has received additional documents and the parties are in settlement discussions. Scheduling Order issued. A Pretrial Conference will be held on November 1 2018 at 9:00 AM. Trial is scheduled for November 8 2018 at 9:00 AM. Three hours is reserved. (mrios) |
||
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney)
Wed 12/27 4:39 PM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By Guadalupe Cordova Jr., Herlinda Cordova, East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA ). (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/20 5:00 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA, Malcolm & Cisneros, a Law Corporation, Nathan Smith(Smith, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Stipulation
Thu 12/14 12:08 PM
Stipulation By East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA and Debtors, Guadalupe Cordova, Jr. and Herlinda Cordova. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA ) (Smith, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing Set
Mon 11/13 10:26 AM
Scheduling Conference Hearing Continued On Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2017 at 10:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (mrios) |
||
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Mon 11/13 12:42 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Hearing Held: 10:00 AM. Appearances: Mayur Patel for the Plaintiff. Nathan Smith for the Defendant. Annoucements heard. By the docket entry the court announced, the oral agreements if any are not the subject of enforcement under the complaint. The court set a deadline of December 13 for an answer to be filed to the second Amended Complaint. A joint report must be filed by December 20. The Scheduling Conference is continued to December 28 at 10:30 AM. (mrios) |
||
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Status Report
Tue 11/07 3:00 PM
Status Report (Filed By Guadalupe Cordova Jr., Herlinda Cordova ) (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Brief
Mon 10/23 6:38 PM
Supplemental Brief (Filed By East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA ) (Smith, Nathan) |
|
Monday, October 09, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 10/09 9:39 AM
Second Amended Complaint (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Withdraw Document
Mon 10/09 9:39 AM
Withdraw Document (Filed By Guadalupe Cordova Jr., Herlinda Cordova ) (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
23 | 23
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 10/09 9:32 AM
Second Amended Complaint (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 10/06 5:11 PM
First Amended Complaint (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
court
Courtroom Minutes (Text)
Fri 09/22 2:43 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Hearing Held: 11:00 AM. Appearances: Mayur Patel for the Plaintiffs. David Smith for the Defendants. Mr. Patel announced he would be amending the complaint to remove Nathan Smith and the Malcolm & Cisneros Law Firm as Defendants. The amended complaint must be filed within 14 days. The court set a deadline of October 23 for briefs to be filed on two topics regarding oral agreements. Oral arguments and scheduling conference is scheduled for November 13 at 10:00 AM. (mrios) |
||
court
Hearing Set
Fri 09/22 2:44 PM
Hearing Set On Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2017 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (mrios) |
||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan(for Attorney)
Thu 09/21 3:41 PM
Joint Discovery Plan/Case Management Plan (Filed By Guadalupe Cordova Jr., Herlinda Cordova, Nathan Smith ). (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 09/14 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 09/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 09/11 3:49 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 9/11/2017 Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2017 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (adol) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 08/31 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 08/31/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Generic Order (Adversary)
Mon 08/28 11:20 AM
Order continuing hearing based on Hurricane Harvey exigencies. Signed on 8/28/2017 (misg) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 08/14 4:53 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA (Smith, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Mon 08/14 4:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Malcolm & Cisneros, a Law Corporation, Nathan Smith (Smith, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Fri 07/07 2:45 PM
Stipulation By East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA, Malcolm & Cisneros, a Law Corporation, Nathan Smith and Plaintiffs, Guadalupe Cordova, Jr. and Herlinda Cordova. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA, Malcolm & Cisneros, a Law Corporation, Nathan Smith ). (Smith, Nathan) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 06/29 12:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 06/28/2017. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate
Wed 06/28 8:57 AM
Certificate of Service of Order Setting Rule 7016 Conference, Requiring Rule 7026 Meeting, Establishing Procedures for Discovery Disputes, and Emphasizing Applicability of Certain Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as Made Applicable by the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (Filed By Guadalupe Cordova Jr., Herlinda Cordova ) (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
11 | 11
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 06/28 8:53 AM
Summons Service Executed on Malcolm & Cisneros, a Law Corporation 6/14/2017. (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
10 | 10
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 06/28 8:53 AM
Summons Service Executed on Nathan Smith 6/14/2017. (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
9 | 9
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Wed 06/28 8:52 AM
Summons Service Executed on East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA 6/14/2017. (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/26 3:11 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 6/26/2017 Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2017 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (adol) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
Summons Issued
Wed 06/14 12:06 PM
Summons Issued on Malcolm & Cisneros, a Law Corporation Date Issued 6/14/2017. (hler) |
|
6 | 6
court
Summons Issued
Wed 06/14 12:05 PM
Summons Issued on Nathan Smith Date Issued 6/14/2017. (hler) |
|
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Wed 06/14 12:03 PM
Summons Issued on East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA Date Issued 6/14/2017. (hler) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Tue 06/13 2:45 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Malcolm & Cisneros, a Law Corporation. (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Tue 06/13 2:44 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Nathan Smith. (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Tue 06/13 2:44 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA. (Guzman, Eloise) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Tue 06/13 1:35 PM
Adversary case 17-03288 Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Complaint by Guadalupe Cordova Jr., Herlinda Cordova against East West Bank f/k/a MetroBank, NA, Nathan Smith, Malcolm & Cisneros, a Law Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (Guzman, Eloise) |