CF FOLKS, LTD. v. DC JEFFERSON BUILDING, LLC
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Tanya S Chutkan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01165 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 4:04 AM EST |
Defendant
DC JEFFERSON BUILDING, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CF FOLKS, LTD.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 31 2018
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/18. (DJS) |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Saturday, March 31, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Sat 03/31 5:07 PM
ORDER granting4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/18. (DJS) |
|
11 | 11
12
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Sat 03/31 5:06 PM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/31/18. (DJS) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Tue 03/20 3:44 PM
STATUS REPORT by CF FOLKS, LTD.. (Wiggins, Ashley) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Mon 03/19 1:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ordered to resubmit a legible copy of Exhibit C to its Complaint (ECF No. 1-1) by Tuesday, March 20, 2018 at noon. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/19/2018. (lctsc2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 03/19 3:58 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to Minute Order filed on 03/19/18, copy of Exhibit C due by 3/20/2018. (tb) |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Wed 07/19 5:44 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DC JEFFERSON BUILDING, LLC. (Vasseghi, Roya) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/19 5:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Roya Vasseghi on behalf of DC JEFFERSON BUILDING, LLC (Vasseghi, Roya) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 07/12 5:36 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CF FOLKS, LTD.. (Wiggins, Ashley) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents
Fri 07/07 2:56 PM
Receipt on 7 05-2017 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 17-CA-003218. (zrdj) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to
Wed 07/05 8:24 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition by CF FOLKS, LTD. (Wiggins, Ashley) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Wed 07/05 4:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Granting5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond by July 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/5/17. (DJS) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 06/21 3:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DC JEFFERSON BUILDING, LLC(Fitzpatrick, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel/Party
Thu 06/15 12:08 PM
NOTICE to Counsel re1 Notice of Removal. (md) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/14 5:56 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DC JEFFERSON BUILDING, LLC. (Charnoff, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 06/14 5:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 17ca3218 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-4991756 filed by DC JEFFERSON BUILDING, LLC.(Charnoff, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Documents from Superior Court, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/15 11:24 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (md) |