Romain v. Adelphi University College of Nursing et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph F Bianco |
Referred: | Gary R Brown |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03587 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability) |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 5:25 AM EST |
Defendant
Adelphi University College of Nursing
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patrick D. Coonan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patricia Facquet
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marilyn Klainberg
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joann Victor-Fassman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr. Andrea McCrink
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maureen C. Roller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johanne Romain
176 Rushmore Street
Westbury, NY 11590 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 06/18 12:38 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and no costs. The clerk of the court shall close the caseOrdered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 6/15/2018. (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 06/15 3:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Adelphi University College of Nursing, Patrick D. Coonan, Patricia Facquet, Marilyn Klainberg, Andrea McCrink, Maureen C. Roller, Joann Victor-Fassman (Dryer, Hayley) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Thu 04/26 12:59 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re11 ,15 : As per the undersigned's individual rules, the movant is directed to provide the court with courtesy copies of all motion papers. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 4/26/2018. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Motion
Thu 04/26 12:53 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION:11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Adelphi University College of Nursing. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 4/25/2018. Motions referred to Gary R. Brown. (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Wed 12/13 2:33 PM
AFFIRMATION by Johanne Romain to further support opposition to defts motion to dismiss (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 12/08 4:20 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss In Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and in Reply to Opposition filed by Adelphi University College of Nursing. (Dryer, Hayley) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Course Syllabus, | ||
Att: 3 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit of Service | ||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Tue 11/14 2:59 PM
AFFIRMATION in opposition to re11 MOTION to Dismiss by Johanne Romain (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Fri 09/29 4:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Adelphi University College of Nursing. (Dryer, Hayley) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Hayley Dryer, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit Affidavit of Andrew McCrink, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Notice Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 12.1, | ||
Att: 12 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 13 Affidavit of Service | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 08/21 4:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bianco:Telephone Conference held on 8/21/2017; MOTION TO BE FILED BY 9/29/2017 ;RESPONSE BY 11/15/2017 ;REPLY BY 12/8/2017 (FTR Log #2:15 - 2:21.) (Bollbach, Jean) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Pre Motion Conference
Wed 07/19 12:29 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference by Adelphi University College of Nursing, Patrick D. Coonan, Patricia Facquet, Marilyn Klainberg, Andrea McCrink, Maureen C. Roller, Joann Victor-Fassman. (Dryer, Hayley) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference
Wed 07/19 1:20 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Pre Motion Conference. The Court has received defendants' letter requesting a pre-motion conference in anticipation of moving to dismiss the complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall participate in a telephone pre-motion conference on Monday, August 21, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. At that time, counsel for defendants shall initiate the call and, once all parties are on the line, shall contact Chambers at (631) 712 5670. Prior to the date of the conference, plaintiff may submit a letter pursuant to Individual Rule III.A explaining why the proposed motion is likely to be unsuccessful. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 7/19/2017. (Zbrozek, Alex) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 06/29 5:03 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application granted. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading no later than July 19, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 6/29/2017. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 06/21 12:41 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Adelphi University College of Nursing, Patrick D. Coonan, Patricia Facquet, Marilyn Klainberg, Andrea McCrink, Maureen C. Roller, Joann Victor-Fassman. (Dryer, Hayley) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/15 11:29 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/15 11:26 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/15 11:29 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bianco and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Wed 06/14 4:37 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re1 Notice of Removal, Affidavit of Service by Adelphi University College of Nursing, Patrick D. Coonan, Patricia Facquet, Marilyn Klainberg, Andrea McCrink, Maureen Roller, Joann Victor-Fassman (Dryer, Hayley) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/14 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James G. Ryan on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Ryan, James) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/14 3:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adelphi University College of Nursing, Patrick D. Coonan, Patricia Facquet, Marilyn Klainberg, Andrea McCrink, Maureen Roller, Joann Victor-Fassman (Dryer, Hayley) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/14 3:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hayley Brooke Dryer on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Dryer, Hayley) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 06/14 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Supreme Court of the State of NY, County of Queens, case number 5239/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9603752) (Dryer, Hayley) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B |