Campbell et al v. City Of Chicago et al
Illinois Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John Z Lee |
Referred: | Sheila M Finnegan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-04467 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 4:22 AM CST |
Amicus
Reverand Michael L Pfleger
|
|
Amicus
Rabbi Seth M Limmer
|
|
Amicus
Jewish Council on Urban Affairs
|
|
Amicus
Cook County Bar Association
|
|
Amicus
Chicago Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
|
|
Defendant
John Coriell
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lawrence Gade, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Peter Jonas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jaeho Jung
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Lavorata
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas McGuire
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Waukeesha Morris
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Josue Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anthony Ostrowski
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angel Pena
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brett Polson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jesus Roman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Todd Stanley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Migel Villanueva
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dorothy Cade
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chad Boylan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Bolin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City Of Chicago
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
411 Movement for Pierre Loury
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chicago Urban League
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deonte Beckwith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Black Lives Matter Chicago
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blocks Together
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brighton Park Neighborhood Council
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Immanuel Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rubin Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rachel Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justice for Families-Black Lives Matter Chicago
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chante Linwood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Network 49
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NAACP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Markees Sharkey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Women's All Points Bulletin
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 12 2018
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/12/18.Mailed notice(ca, ) |
1. | Federal Lawsuit could force change in Chicago (chicagotribune.com) |
Submitted Thu 06/15/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 07/19/2022 8:19 PM CDT |
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. (daj, ) | ||
1 | 1 132 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Network 49, Black Lives Matter Chicago, Rubin Carter, Immanuel Campbell, 411 Movement for Pierre Loury, Rachel Jackson, Markees Sharkey, Brighton Park Neighborhood Council, Women's All Points Bulletin, Blocks Together, Deonte Beckwith, Justice for Families-Black Lives Matter Chicago, Chante Linwood; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-13274362.(Van Brunt, Alexa) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Van Brunt, Alexa) | |
3 | 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 411 Movement for Pierre Loury, Deonte Beckwith, Black Lives Matter Chicago, Blocks Together, Brighton Park Neighborhood Council, Immanuel Campbell, Rubin Carter, Rachel Jackson, Justice for Families-Black Lives Matter Chicago, Chante Linwood, Network 49, Markees Sharkey, Women's All Points Bulletin by Alexa Van Brunt (Van Brunt, Alexa) | |
4 | 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 411 Movement for Pierre Loury, Deonte Beckwith, Black Lives Matter Chicago, Blocks Together, Brighton Park Neighborhood Council, Immanuel Campbell, Rubin Carter, Rachel Jackson, Justice for Families-Black Lives Matter Chicago, Chante Linwood, Network 49, Markees Sharkey, Women's All Points Bulletin by Bedi A Sheila (Sheila, Bedi) | |
5 | 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 411 Movement for Pierre Loury, Deonte Beckwith, Black Lives Matter Chicago, Blocks Together, Brighton Park Neighborhood Council, Immanuel Campbell, Rubin Carter, Rachel Jackson, Justice for Families-Black Lives Matter Chicago, Chante Linwood, Network 49, Markees Sharkey, Women's All Points Bulletin by Craig Benson Futterman (Futterman, Craig) | |
6 | 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 411 Movement for Pierre Loury, Deonte Beckwith, Black Lives Matter Chicago, Blocks Together, Brighton Park Neighborhood Council, Immanuel Campbell, Rubin Carter, Rachel Jackson, Justice for Families-Black Lives Matter Chicago, Chante Linwood, Network 49, Markees Sharkey, Women's All Points Bulletin by Andrew Martin Stroth (Stroth, Andrew) | |
7 | 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs 411 Movement for Pierre Loury, Deonte Beckwith, Black Lives Matter Chicago, Blocks Together, Brighton Park Neighborhood Council, Immanuel Campbell, Rubin Carter, Rachel Jackson, Justice for Families-Black Lives Matter Chicago, Chante Linwood, Network 49, Markees Sharkey, Women's All Points Bulletin by Carlton E. Odim (Odim, Carlton) | |
8 | 8 MOTION by Plaintiffs 411 Movement for Pierre Loury, Deonte Beckwith, Black Lives Matter Chicago, Blocks Together, Brighton Park Neighborhood Council, Immanuel Campbell, Rubin Carter, Rachel Jackson, Justice for Families-Black Lives Matter Chicago, Chante Linwood, Network 49, Markees Sharkey, Women's All Points Bulletin to certify class Responses due by 7/14/2017(Sheila, Bedi) | |
Att: 1 Declaration Bedi, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration Bedi 2, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration Stroth, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration Odim, | ||
Att: 7 Declaration Shiller | ||
9 | 9 NOTICE of Motion by Bedi A Sheila for presentment of motion to certify class,,8 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 6/21/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Sheila, Bedi) |