Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-11452

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin J Carey
Case #: 1:17-ap-50579
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 15, 2017
Terminated:May 17, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
ExportTek Inc.
Represented By
ExportTek Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Curtis R. Smith, As Liquidating Trustee Of The Hastings Creditors' Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Maria Aprile Sawczuk
Goldstein & Mcclintock Lllp
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Bethany J. Rubis
Ask LLP
contact info
Kara E Casteel
Ask Financial LLP
contact info
Edward E Neiger
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, May 17, 2018
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/17 1:37 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Curtis R. Smith, As Liquidating Trustee Of The Hastings Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/17 2:37 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50579 Closed (LMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
12 12 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Mon 04/09 11:36 AM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 06/8/2018. (Felger, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/01 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/31/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, January 29, 2018
10 10 1 pgs court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order) Mon 01/29 2:16 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Special Order). Mark Felger is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/29/2018. (LMD)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, January 26, 2018
9 9 notice Selection of Mediator - Notice Fri 01/26 10:53 AM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Filed by Curtis R. Smith, As Liquidating Trustee Of The Hastings Creditors' Liquidating Trust (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2017
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/20 2:59 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by ExportTek Inc. Mediation due date: 02/20/2018.(Dick, R.)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, August 30, 2017
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 08/30 5:17 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Curtis R. Smith, As Liquidating Trustee Of The Hastings Creditors' Liquidating Trust. (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-]
6 6 10 pgs order Order Wed 08/30 11:08 AM
Order Regarding Motion of Curtis R. Smith as Liquidation Trustee of the Hasting Creditors Liquidation Trust for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 Order Signed on 8/30/2017 (LMD)
Related: [-]
court Terminate Hearings (Multi) Wed 08/30 11:19 AM
Terminate Hearings (Multi) (LMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2017
5 5 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 08/29 11:31 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by Hastings Creditors Liquidating Trust. (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2017
4 4 motion Approve - Motion Fri 07/21 5:38 PM
Motion of Curtis R. Smith as Liquidation Trustee of the Hasting Creditors Liquidation Trust for Order Establishing Procedures Governing Associated Adversary Proceedings Brought Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 and 550 Filed by Curtis R. Smith, As Liquidating Trustee Of The Hastings Creditors' Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 8/30/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/4/2017. (Sawczuk, Maria) Modified docket text on 7/24/2017 (LMD)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 06/23 4:25 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant ExportTek Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 8/30/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 8/22/2017. (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, June 16, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 06/16 2:01 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-50579 KJC) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8486584, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2017
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 06/15 1:04 PM
Adversary case 17-50579 Complaint by Curtis R. Smith, As Liquidating Trustee Of The Hastings Creditors' Liquidating Trust against ExportTek Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 09/13/2017. (Sawczuk, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice Of Dispute Resolution Alternatives