United States of America v. Cioffero
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ann M Donnelly |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03608 |
Nature of Suit | 152 Contract - Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans) |
Cause | 28:1345 Default of Student Loan |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 4:10 AM EST |
Defendant
William Cioffero
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 30, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice(Other)
Thu 11/30 3:46 PM
NOTICE by United States of America re10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment satisfaction of judgment (Manfredi, John) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 11/10 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Manfredi on behalf of United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Manfredi, John) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tue 10/10 2:42 PM
ORDER re9 Motion for Default Judgment; application granted. Signed by Thameera Ramesar Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer Clerk of Court on 10/10/2017. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Default Judgment
Thu 10/05 9:16 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment by United States of America. (Iannarone, Liberatore) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 09/27 3:32 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant William Cioffero has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant William Cioffero is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Tue 09/26 10:55 AM
Request for Certificate of Default by United States of America (Iannarone, Liberatore) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Service | ||
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Tue 09/26 10:53 AM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION Non-Military affidavid with DOD report by United States of America (Iannarone, Liberatore) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/18 7:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. William Cioffero served on 8/8/2017, answer due 8/29/2017. (Iannarone, Liberatore) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/15 4:43 PM
Summons Issued as to William Cioffero. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/15 4:42 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/15 4:42 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/15 11:59 AM
COMPLAINT against William Cioffero Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by United States of America. (Iannarone, Liberatore) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/15 4:41 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |