Mitropoulos v. 401 Sunrise Corp., et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Steven Tiscione |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03618 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 18, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 4:32 AM EST |
Defendant
Nickolas Mavromihalis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
401 Sunrise Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aristomenis Mitropoulos
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, February 18, 2021 | ||
97 | 97
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement Order Dismissing Case
Thu 02/18 3:20 PM
ORDER granting94 Motion for Settlement. Having presided over settlement discussions and having reviewed the settlement agreement and plaintiff's letter dated February 8, 2021, Docket Entry 94, I find that "the agreement reflects a reasonable compromise of disputed issues [rather] than a mere waiver of statutory rights brought about by an employer's overreaching." Le v. SITA Information Networking Computing, USA, Inc., 2008 WL 724155 (E.D.N.Y. Mar. 13, 2008)(internal quotations and citation omitted). See also Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015). The settlement is therefore approved, the case is dismissed with prejudice and closed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 2/18/2021. (Vasquez, Lea) |