Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. v. Horta et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Gustavo A Gelpi |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01797 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 5:05 AM AST |
Defendant
Roberto Mendoza Horta
|
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
|
Plaintiff
Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
misc
Notice of Docket Text Modification
Tue 12/20 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re 106 Proposed Voir Dire ***FILED IN ERROR - As per Counsel's request. Documents to be re-filed*** (gav) |
||
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Judgment
Wed 06/12 10:10 AM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE the instant case against all defendants. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/12/2019. (AGF) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 06/12 10:05 AM
ORDER: Granting7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 6/12/2019. (AGF) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Thu 01/24 5:29 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, this case has been randomly reassigned to his docket. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2019. (nat) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Tue 11/20 10:26 AM
MOTION to dismiss as to Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. filed by Jeannine M. Carlo-Melendez on behalf of Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. Responses due by 12/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carlo-Melendez, Jeannine) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/21 8:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeannine M. Carlo-Melendez on behalf of Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. (Carlo-Melendez, Jeannine) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 07/10 9:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. upon United States of America served on 6/28/2017, answer due 8/28/2017. (Saez-Marrero, Andres) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/10 9:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. upon Roberto Mendoza Horta served on 7/6/2017, answer due 7/27/2017. (Saez-Marrero, Andres) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/16 9:24 AM
Summons Issued as to Roberto Mendoza Horta, United States of America (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Fri 06/16 8:55 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G Young (arg) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/15 11:15 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5486442.), filed by Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.. Service due by 9/13/2017,(Saez-Marrero, Andres) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Note, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Mortgage, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Summons |