Medina v.Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03614 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 12, 2017 4:48 AM EST |
Defendant
Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawanda Medina
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 10/11 5:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (Markowitz, Nicole) |
|
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 10/11 5:25 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry11 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/11/2017. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/05 11:00 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brett B. Goodman, Esq. is permitted to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. By September 12, 2017, Mr. Goodman shall register for ECF. Registration is available online at the EDNY's homepage. Once registered, Mr. Goodman shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Mr. Goodman shall also ensure that the $150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerk's Office. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 9/5/2017. (Miao, Tiffany) |
||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/31 5:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9799270. by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.. (Goodman, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 06/29 9:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for all Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures: July 31, 2017. First request for production of documents and first request for interrogatories due by: August 28, 2017. Deadline for joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings: September 27, 2017. All discovery, including all expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), if any, to be completed by: October 27, 2017. Pretrial Conference ( ex parte statements of settlement position due via email two business days in advance): November 9, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. Dispositive motion process started by: November 24, 2017. Joint pretrial order due by: December 21, 2017. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. . Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/29/2017. (Guy, Alicia) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order(Other)
Thu 06/29 9:31 AM
ORDER -- I will not require an initial discovery planning conference in this case, and the parties are not required to meet and confer in accordance with Rule 26(f). Instead, I will enter a separate case management and scheduling order that contemplates the completion of all discovery within four months. If there is an objection to the court's schedule, any party may either: (1) upon a showing of good cause and with the other party's consent, submit a proposed discovery plan in the form of the attached questionnaire; or (2) submit a letter request for an in-court conference that also sets forth the grounds for a different schedule. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 6/29/2017. (Guy, Alicia) |
|
Att: 1 Questionnaire | ||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/23 7:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward B. Geller on behalf of Shawanda Medina (notification declined or already on case) (Geller, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/21 3:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. (Fried, Howard) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/21 3:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.. (Fried, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 06/20 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Civil Court of Queens County, case number 010371/2017. (Markowitz, Nicole) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Fri 06/16 4:02 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Fri 06/16 4:00 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 06/16 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. from Civil Court of the City of NY, County of Queens, case number 010371/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9611341) (Markowitz, Nicole) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/16/2017) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Petition for Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Summons and Complaint | ||
Att: 4 (6/16/2017) Notice | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/16 3:59 PM
Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |