UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PHILLIPS
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Robin M Meriweather |
Case #: | 1:17-mc-01441 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 01/25 3:04 PM
ORDER granting Petitioner's oral motion to withdraw1 Petition to Enforce I.R.S. Summonses and denying Respondent's 3 Motion for Ancillary Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 01/25/2018. (lcrm1) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 10/27 1:55 PM
Minute Entry for Status Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 10/27/17 : Case called for Show Cause Hearing, but not held. The respondent, VINCENT PHILLIPS, did not appear in person, but later appeared by telephone. The Government indicated that the respondent recently filed the requested tax returns and that the summonses that were issued by the IRS have now been satisfied. Oral Request by Petitioner UNITED STATES OF AMERICA to Withdraw its Petition to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summonses1 . Order to be issued. Petitioner's Counsel: Claire Whittaker; Respondent's Counsel: Vincent Phillips (Pro Se). (Court Reporter: FTR Gold - Ctrm. 7; FTR Time Frame: 11:41:49 - 11:54:14) (kk) |
||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 09/11 10:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting the Petitioners request for a Show Cause Hearing: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a Show Cause Hearing on 10/27/17 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. It is further ORDERED that Respondent should be prepared to show cause as to why he should not be compelled to obey the Internal Revenue Service summons served upon him on December 13, 2016. Only those issues raised in the pleadings will be considered during the show cause hearing. Any uncontested allegation(s) in the petition shall be considered admitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 09/11/2017. (lcrm1) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 09/11 10:46 AM
Set/Reset Hearings : Show Cause Hearing set for 10/27/17 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. (kk) |
||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response to (non-motion) Document
Wed 08/09 6:26 PM
RESPONSE re1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons (Please see ECF No. 7 for Duplicate Image) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Wed 08/09 6:21 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re 3 MOTION for Ancillary Relief filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 07/12 9:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Having considered Petitioner's5 Motion for Extension of Time, the motion is hereby GRANTED. Petitioner's response to Respondent's 3 Motion for Ancillary Relief shall be due on or before August 9, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 07/12/17. (lcrm2) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 07/11 6:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 3 MOTION for Ancillary Relief . (Whitaker, Claire) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 07/11 5:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 3 MOTION for Ancillary Relief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Tue 07/11 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Tammy Allison Holloway (Whitaker, Claire) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 07/06 4:02 PM
MOTION for Ancillary Relief by VINCENT PHILLIPS; (See docket entry no.2 to view document.) (td) |
|
2 | 2
respm
Response to (non-motion) Document
Thu 07/06 3:59 PM
RESPONSE (Opposition) re1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by VINCENT PHILLIPS. (td) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Fri 06/16 3:07 PM
PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(jf) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |